Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 05:09:59 (UTC).

BARNES VS HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 BARNES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARNES, MIESHA

Defendants

ROLLAIN, SAM

HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC

Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC

PINAL, KRISTINA

Davis, John

HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION

Hilton Management LLC

CHH Torrey Pines Tenant Corp; DBA : Hilton La Jolla Torrey Pines

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Smith, Marc

Attorney at SMITH LEGAL CENTER APC

Greenslade, Michael

Defendant Attorney

Gramling, Kevin J

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC

Amendment to Complaint (Amendments)

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 2) filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: CHH Torrey Pines Tenant Corp

Amendment to Complaint (Amendments)

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 3) filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: Hilton Management LLC

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: CHH Torrey Pines Tenant Corp

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: Hilton Management LLC

Answer

Answer filed by CHH Torrey Pines Tenant Corp; Hilton Management LLC; Davis, John.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by BARNES, MIESHA.

Substitution of Attorney (Participant Information)

Substitution of Attorney filed by BARNES, MIESHA.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by BARNES, MIESHA.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by BARNES, MIESHA.

Complaint

Complaint filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION; HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC; Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC; ROLLAIN, SAM; PINAL, KRISTINA; Davis, John

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION; HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC; Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC; ROLLAIN, SAM; PINAL, KRISTINA; Davis, John

Original Summons

[A document for ROA# 3]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: CHH Torrey Pines Tenant Corp Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: Hilton Management LLC Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by CHH Torrey Pines Tenant Corp; Hilton Management LLC; Davis, John. Filed By: CHH Torrey Pines Tenant Corp (Defendant); Hilton Management LLC (Defendant); Davis, John (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First Amended) filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC; HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION; HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC; ROLLAIN, SAM; PINAL, KRISTINA; Davis, John; CHH Torrey Pines Tenant Corp; Hilton Management LLC Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION; HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC; Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC; ROLLAIN, SAM; PINAL, KRISTINA; Davis, John Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION; HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC; Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC; ROLLAIN, SAM; PINAL, KRISTINA; Davis, John Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by BARNES, MIESHA. Refers to: HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION; HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC; Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC; ROLLAIN, SAM; PINAL, KRISTINA; Davis, John Filed By: BARNES, MIESHA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hilton Reservations Worldwide LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON HHONORS WORLDWIDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hilton Resorts Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant