Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/14/2021 at 07:56:27 (UTC).

Barden vs Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Barden filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barden, Leslie F

Defendants

Badawy, Alaa

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Serpa, Consuelo

Thomas, Tanisha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shegerian, Carney R

Attorney at SHEGERIAN AND ASSOCIATES INC

Defendant Attorney

Pelochino, Joseph E

Attorney at ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUDD & ROMO

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Serpa, Consuelo

DEFENDANT KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Badawy, Alaa; Serpa, Consuelo; Thomas, Tanisha

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Badawy, Alaa; Serpa, Consuelo; Thomas, Tanisha

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Badawy, Alaa; Serpa, Consuelo; Thomas, Tanisha

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. Filed By: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Serpa, Consuelo Filed By: Barden, Leslie F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc Filed By: Barden, Leslie F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Badawy, Alaa; Serpa, Consuelo; Thomas, Tanisha Filed By: Barden, Leslie F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Badawy, Alaa; Serpa, Consuelo; Thomas, Tanisha Filed By: Barden, Leslie F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Barden, Leslie F. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Badawy, Alaa; Serpa, Consuelo; Thomas, Tanisha Filed By: Barden, Leslie F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R