This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/25/2018 at 06:25:02 (UTC).

Barbara J Amundsen vs. Antoine C Eason

Case Summary

On 01/26/2009 Barbara J Amundsen filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Antoine C Eason. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-EC

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMUNDSEN, BARBARA J

Defendants

KNATT, BRITTANY

KNATT, DESIREE

EASON, ANTOINE C; AKA : EASON, ACE;AKA : EASON, AC

EASON, DAWN M

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

Writ of Execution submitted by Amundsen, Barbara J rejected on 07/27/2009. Refers to: Eason, Antoine; Eason, Dawn

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 06/23/2009 10:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 05/26/2009 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 05/26/2009 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-01 .

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 03/03/2009 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 03/03/2009 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-01 .

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Eason, Dawn M, on 02/05/2009, has expired.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Eason, Antoine C, on 02/05/2009, has expired.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Knatt, Brittany, on 02/05/2009, has expired.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Knatt, Desiree, on 02/05/2009, has expired.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Amundsen, Barbara J. Refers to: Eason, Antoine; Eason, Dawn Filed By: Amundsen, Barbara J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2009
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Amundsen, Barbara J. Refers to: Eason, Antoine; Eason, Dawn Filed By: Amundsen, Barbara J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Amundsen, Barbara J. Refers to: Eason, Antoine; Eason, Dawn Filed By: Amundsen, Barbara J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution submitted by Amundsen, Barbara J rejected on 07/27/2009. Refers to: Eason, Antoine; Eason, Dawn Filed By: Amundsen, Barbara J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Amundsen, Barbara J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Amundsen, Barbara J. Refers to: Knatt, Brittany; Knatt, Desiree Filed By: Amundsen, Barbara J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • DocketAnswer filed by Knatt, Brittany; Knatt, Desiree. Refers to: Amundsen, Barbara Filed By: Knatt, Brittany (Defendant); Knatt, Desiree (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2009
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Knatt, Brittany; Knatt, Desiree. Filed By: Knatt, Brittany (Defendant); Knatt, Desiree (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • DocketAnswer filed by Eason, Antoine C; Eason, Dawn M. Refers to: Amundsen, Barbara Filed By: Eason, Antoine C (Defendant); Eason, Dawn M (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Eason, Antoine C; Eason, Dawn M. Filed By: Eason, Antoine C (Defendant); Eason, Dawn M (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-01.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Amundsen, Barbara J. Refers to: Eason, Antoine; Eason, Dawn; Knatt, Desiree; Knatt, Brittany Filed By: Amundsen, Barbara J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Amundsen, Barbara J. Refers to: Eason, Antoine; Eason, Dawn; Knatt, Desiree; Knatt, Brittany Filed By: Amundsen, Barbara J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2009
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Amundsen, Barbara J. Refers to: Eason, Antoine; Eason, Dawn; Knatt, Desiree; Knatt, Brittany Filed By: Amundsen, Barbara J (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • DocketCase details updated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less