This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 06:59:13 (UTC).

BARAJAS VS IVEY

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 BARAJAS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against IVEY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARAJAS, RICHARD

Defendants

Valadez DDS, Javier ; ESA : VALDEZ DDS, JAVIER

IVEY DDS, PETER

Javier Valadez DDS Inc; ESA : NEW DAY SMILE;DBA : New Day Smile

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hiney, Donald D

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF DONALD D HINEY APC

333 H St Suite 5000

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorneys

Hoynacki, David A

401 West A Street Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Kamel, Brian P

Attorney at BRIAN P KAMEL & ASSOCIATES

1299 Ocean Avenue 310

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Order Signed 04/02/2021) filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Order Signed 04/02/2021) filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by IVEY DDS, PETER.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by IVEY DDS, PETER.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Valadez DDS, Javier; Javier Valadez DDS Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/10/2021 11:00:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Valadez DDS, Javier; Javier Valadez DDS Inc.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number (Participant Information)

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Javier Valadez DDS Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Javier Valdez) filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: Valadez DDS, Javier

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Peter Ivy DDS) filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: IVEY DDS, PETER

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to New Day Smile) filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: Javier Valadez DDS Inc

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by IVEY DDS, PETER.

Answer

Answer filed by Javier Valadez DDS Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 06/10/2021 at 11:00:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

Complaint

Complaint filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: IVEY, PETER; VALDEZ, JAVIER; NEW DAY SMILE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: IVEY, PETER; VALDEZ, JAVIER; NEW DAY SMILE

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: IVEY, PETER; VALDEZ, JAVIER; NEW DAY SMILE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Javier Valadez DDS Inc. Filed By: Javier Valadez DDS Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Filed By: BARAJAS, RICHARD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 09:45AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 10:00AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/10/2021 11:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Valadez DDS, Javier; Javier Valadez DDS Inc. Filed By: Valadez DDS, Javier (Defendant); Javier Valadez DDS Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Valadez DDS, Javier; Javier Valadez DDS Inc. Filed By: Valadez DDS, Javier (Defendant); Javier Valadez DDS Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by IVEY DDS, PETER. Filed By: IVEY DDS, PETER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Javier Valdez) filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: Valadez DDS, Javier Filed By: BARAJAS, RICHARD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Peter Ivy DDS) filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: IVEY DDS, PETER Filed By: BARAJAS, RICHARD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to New Day Smile) filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: Javier Valadez DDS Inc Filed By: BARAJAS, RICHARD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: IVEY DDS, PETER; Valadez DDS, Javier; Javier Valadez DDS Inc Filed By: BARAJAS, RICHARD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: IVEY DDS, PETER; Valadez DDS, Javier; Javier Valadez DDS Inc Filed By: BARAJAS, RICHARD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by BARAJAS, RICHARD. Refers to: IVEY DDS, PETER; Valadez DDS, Javier; Javier Valadez DDS Inc Filed By: BARAJAS, RICHARD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAMEL BRIAN PATRICK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOYNACKI DAVID A.