This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 13:24:45 (UTC).

Banger vs Nguyen

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 Banger filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nguyen. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EARL H. MAAS, III. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EARL H. MAAS, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELANGER, ROBERT

NGUYEN, MINH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MORELIA, EMILY

Morelia, Leonila ; ESA : Morelia, Leonia

Turner, Denis Paul

Turner, David

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

NGUYEN, MINH

Turner, Denis Paul

Turner, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CARUANA, MARK V

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARK V CARUANA

2928 Jefferson Street

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Garchie, Peter L

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

701 B Street 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Fonseca, Alise M

Attorney at HARRIS PERSONAL INJURY LAWYERS INC

301 Mission Avenue 203

Oceanside, CA 92054

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Romell, Aleksandra

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMENT & WILLIAMS ABREGO

3111 Camino Del Rio North Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Belanger, Robert. Refers to: Nguyen, Minh

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Nguyen, Minh. Refers to: Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Nguyen, Minh. Refers to: Turner, Denis

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Belanger, Robert; Nguyen, Minh; Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila. Refers to: Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila; Nguyen, Minh; Turner, David; Turner, Denis; Turner, David; Turner, Denis

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Nguyen, Minh. Refers to: Turner, Denis; Turner, David

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (AND ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT - GRANTED) filed by Nguyen, Minh.

Answer

Answer filed by Nguyen, Minh. Refers to: Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila Irene.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila Irene. Refers to: Turner, Denis; Turner, David

Original Summons

Original Summons (cross complaint) filed by Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila Irene. Refers to: Turner, Denis; Turner, David

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (CONSOLIDATE 18-58527) filed by Nguyen, Minh.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila. Refers to: Nguyen, Minh

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Nguyen, Minh. Refers to: Turner, Denis; Turner, David; Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila

Answer

Answer filed by Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonia.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (DEMAND JURY) filed by Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonia.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Nguyen, Minh. Refers to: Turner, Denis Filed By: Nguyen, Minh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Turner, Denis Paul .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Nguyen, Minh. Refers to: Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila Filed By: Nguyen, Minh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Belanger, Robert. Refers to: Nguyen, Minh Filed By: Belanger, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Nguyen, Minh. Refers to: Turner, Denis; Turner, David Filed By: Nguyen, Minh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Turner, David .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Nguyen, Minh .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonia. Filed By: Morelia, Emily (Defendant); Morelia, Leonila (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Belanger, Robert. Refers to: Morelia, Emily Filed By: Belanger, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Belanger, Robert. Refers to: Nguyen, Minh Filed By: Belanger, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Belanger, Robert. Refers to: Nguyen, Minh; Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila Filed By: Belanger, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Belanger, Robert. Refers to: Nguyen, Minh; Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila Filed By: Belanger, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Belanger, Robert. Refers to: Nguyen, Minh; Morelia, Emily; Morelia, Leonila Filed By: Belanger, Robert (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCHIE, PETER L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FONSECA ALISE MARIE