This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 04:15:35 (UTC).

Bakker vs US Bank NA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Bakker filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against US Bank NA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bakker, Karinna R

Fallbrook, CA 92028

Bakker, Simona R

Defendants

Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP

US Bank NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ribar, Gwen H

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal After Order Granting Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.

Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal After Sustaining of Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.

(Proposed) Judgment of Dismissal After Order Granting Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint

Judgment of Dismissal filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.

(Proposed)Judgment of Dismissal After Sustaining of Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Judgment of Dismissal filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.

Notice of Ruling on Defendant Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP's Special Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-Slapp)

Notice of Ruling filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.

Notice of Ruling on Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Notice of Ruling filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for SLAPP / SLAPPback Motion Hearing heard 07/01/2022 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 07/01/2022 01:30:00 PM.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for SLAPP / SLAPPback Motion Hearing published.

PLAINTIFFS JOINT RESPONSE TO THE DEMURRERS AND ANTI-SLAPP MOTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANTS, US BANK, NA, AND BY WRIGHT, FINLAY, & ZAK, LLP.

Response (7/1/22) filed by Bakker, Karinna R; Bakker, Simona R.

Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.

Reply in Support of Special Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-Slapp)

Reply filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.

Reply in Support of Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Reply filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.

Request for Judicial Notice (Requests)

Request for Judicial Notice (ISO Demurrer & Motion to Strike (7/01/22)) filed by US Bank NA; Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (ISO Meet & Confer (7/01/22)) filed by US Bank NA; Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP.

Motion to Strike (Motions)

Motion to Strike (7/01/22) filed by US Bank NA; Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (ISO Demurrer Meet & Confer (7/01/22) filed by US Bank NA; Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.; Filed By: Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP (Defendant); US Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.; Filed By: Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP (Defendant); US Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment of Dismissal filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.; Filed By: Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP (Defendant); US Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment of Dismissal filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.; Filed By: Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP (Defendant); US Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for US Bank NA and against Bakker, Karinna R ;Bakker, Simona R for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP and against Bakker, Karinna R ;Bakker, Simona R for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 5246.50, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 5246.50.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.; Filed By: Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP (Defendant); US Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.; Filed By: Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP (Defendant); US Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for SLAPP / SLAPPback Motion Hearing heard 07/01/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSLAPP / SLAPPback Motion Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; US Bank NA.; Filed By: Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP (Defendant); US Bank NA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bakker, Karinna R; Bakker, Simona R. Refers to: US Bank NA; Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; Filed By: Bakker, Karinna R (Plaintiff); Bakker, Simona R (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bakker, Karinna R; Bakker, Simona R. Refers to: US Bank NA; Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; Filed By: Bakker, Karinna R (Plaintiff); Bakker, Simona R (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bakker, Karinna R; Bakker, Simona R. Refers to: US Bank NA; Law Firm of Wright Finlay and Zak LLP; Filed By: Bakker, Karinna R (Plaintiff); Bakker, Simona R (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIBAR GWEN H. ESQ.