This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:03:17 (UTC).

Bacino vs Pacific Coast Flyers Inc

Case Summary

On 03/23/2016 Bacino filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pacific Coast Flyers Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BACINO, AMANDA

BACINO, SIENA

BACINO, BRODY

MARTZ, LYDIA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PACIFIC COAST FLYERS INC

BACINO, AMANDA

ALEXANDROVICH, PODDOUBNYI

ESTATE OF DAVID K MARTZ

CARLSBAD AIR SERVICE, INC.; DBA : ADVANCED AIRCRAFT SERVICES

CORONA AIRCRAFT ENGINES, INC.

AERO PROPELLER COMPANY, INC.

CARLSBAD AIRSERVICE INC; DBA : ADVANCED AIRCRAFT SERVICES

PERSONAL PLANE TECH INC; DBA : AEROMECHANIX

ADVANCED AIRCRAFT SERVICES

PERSONAL PLANE TECH, INC.; DBA : AEROMECHANIX

CORONA AIRCRAFT ENGINES INC

AERO PROPELLER COMPANY INC

CONTINENTAL MOTORS, INC.

EASTATE OF DAVID K MARTZ

CARLSBAD AIR SERVICES

Guardian Ad Litem

SCHUETZ, DANN

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANTZ, JAMES P

CASEY, DAVID S

110 Laurel St

San Diego, CA 92101

EVANS, JASON C

110 Laurel St

San Diego, CA 92101

CUMMINS, SCOTT C

110 Laurel St

San Diego, CA 92101

FRANCAVILLA, ROBERT J

110 Laurel St

San Diego, CA 92101

CASEY, DAVID S JR

LIAKOS, JENNIFER

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WORTHE, TODD C

WORTHE, TODD C.

FRANTZ, JAMES P

TERHAR, MICHAEL J

MONTANARI, GARRY LEE

PAHL, DOUGLAS J

KIRK, J. DOUGLAS

2201 Dupont 820

Irvine, CA 92612

SCHANZ, WILLIAM L

Other Attorneys

SKINNER, WILL S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Bacino, Amanda. Refers to: Pacific Coast Flyers Inc; Estate of David K Martz; Alexandrovich, Poddoubnyi

Notice of Court Vacating Dates In Non-Lead Case SD

Notice of Court Vacating Dates In Non-Lead Case SD generated.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Martz, Lydia; Martz, Kaden. Refers to: Personal Plane Tech Inc; Corona Aircraft Engines Inc; Carlsbad Airservice Inc; Advanced Aircraft Services; Aero Propeller Company Inc; Continental Motors Inc; Pacific Coast Flyers Inc; Alexandrovich, Poddoubnyi

Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer filed by Aero Propeller Company, Inc.. Refers to: Bacino, Amanda

Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Aero Propeller Company Inc.

Petition to Approve Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability (Subsequent Petition)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Claim of Minor or Adult Person with Disability (Subsequent Petition) (Minor Siena Bacino) filed by SCHUETZ, DANN; Bacino, Siena.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Pacific Coast Flyers Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/02/2016 01:00:00 PM.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Personal Plane Tech Inc - served Niccolai Murphy) filed by Martz, Lydia; Martz, Kaden. Refers to: Personal Plane Tech Inc

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Plaintiffs Attorney M. Regina Bagdasarian approved and signed dismissal) filed by Continental Motors, Inc..

Notice of Court Vacating Dates In Non-Lead Case SD

Notice of Court Vacating Dates In Non-Lead Case SD generated.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Martz, Lydia; Martz, Kaden. Refers to: Corona Aircraft Engines Inc

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Linda Pool, CSR#8941) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Answer

Answer filed by Carlsbad Airservice Inc.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order that answers on file for Pacific Coast Flyers Inc and Poddoubnyi Alexandrovich will serve as their answers to plaintiff first amended complaint) filed by Pacific Coast Flyers Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Corona Aircraft Engines Inc.

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Proposed Order (Proposed Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) submitted by Aero Propeller Company Inc received but not filed on 09/20/2018.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Bacino, Amanda. Refers to: Carlsbad Airservice Inc

191 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Bacino, Brody; Bacino, Siena. Refers to: Personal Plane Tech, Inc. Filed By: Bacino, Brody (Plaintiff); Bacino, Siena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Martz, Lydia; Martz, Kaden. Filed By: Martz, Lydia (Plaintiff); Martz, Kaden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Bacino, Siena. Refers to: Corona Aircraft Engines Inc Filed By: Bacino, Siena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/13/2019 02:50:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Alexandrovich, Poddoubnyi .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Pacific Coast Flyers Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Aero Propeller Company Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Advanced Aircraft Services.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Carlsbad Airservice Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
322 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Pacific Coast Flyers Inc. Filed By: Pacific Coast Flyers Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2016 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Bacino, Brody; Bacino, Siena. Refers to: Pacific Coast Flyers Inc; Estate of David K Martz; Alexandrovich, Poddoubnyi; Bacino, Amanda Filed By: Bacino, Brody (Plaintiff); Bacino, Siena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Bacino, Brody; Bacino, Siena. Refers to: Pacific Coast Flyers Inc; Estate of David K Martz; Alexandrovich, Poddoubnyi; Bacino, Amanda Filed By: Bacino, Brody (Plaintiff); Bacino, Siena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Bacino, Brody; Bacino, Siena. Refers to: Pacific Coast Flyers Inc; Estate of David K Martz; Alexandrovich, Poddoubnyi; Bacino, Amanda Filed By: Bacino, Brody (Plaintiff); Bacino, Siena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bacino, Brody; Bacino, Siena. Refers to: Pacific Coast Flyers Inc; Estate of David K Martz; Alexandrovich, Poddoubnyi; Bacino, Amanda Filed By: Bacino, Brody (Plaintiff); Bacino, Siena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Bacino, Brody; Bacino, Siena. Refers to: Pacific Coast Flyers Inc; Estate of David K Martz; Alexandrovich, Poddoubnyi; Bacino, Amanda; SCHUETZ, DANN Filed By: Bacino, Brody (Plaintiff); Bacino, Siena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.