This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/30/2019 at 22:22:04 (UTC).

Bachman Flats Homeowners Associations vs Bachman Flats LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2015 Bachman Flats Homeowners Associations filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Bachman Flats LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BACHMAN FLATS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BACHMAN FLATS LLC

LOYA CONSTRUCTORS INC

RUVALCABA, CARLOS ; DBA : C J R CONSTRUCTION

VILENSKI, BENJAMIN

POSADA, EDUARDO

LOYA CONSTRUCTORS, INC.

PACIFIC ORNAMENTAL IRON & MUFFLERS

URBITECTURE LLC

GARCIA PLASTERING

DI DONATO JR, ALLEN ; DBA : DI DONATO ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BELL, JACOB D

440 Stevens Ave #350

Solana Beach, CA 92075

HAGEN, CHRISTOPHER H

Attorney at WARD & HAGEN LLP

440 Stevens Ave #350

Solana Beach, CA 92075

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PROOS, ERIC J

36 Malaga Cove Plaza

Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274

MITCH, BRENNAN J

36 Malaga Cove Plaza

Palos Verdes Estates, CA 90274

CARLSON, ROBERT C

Attorney at KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

225 Broadway 21St Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

ZACKARY, FORT A

225 Broadway 21St Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

RAMIREZ, MANUEL LUIS

Attorney at THE RAMIREZ LAW FIRM

185 West F Street 100

San Diego, CA 92101

BALESTRERI, THOMAS A JR

Attorney at BALESTRERI POTOCKI & HOLMES

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CARLSON, ROBERT C

Attorney at KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

225 Broadway 21St Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

ZACKARY, FORT A

225 Broadway 21St Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

RAMIREZ, MANUEL LUIS

Attorney at THE RAMIREZ LAW FIRM

185 West F Street 100

San Diego, CA 92101

BALESTRERI, THOMAS A JR

Attorney at BALESTRERI POTOCKI & HOLMES

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

JACOBSEN, GARY L

Attorney at KOENIG JACOBSEN LLP

16300 Bake Pkwy

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

Does 2 - 4

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Does 2 - 4) filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association; Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Refers to: Ruvalcaba, Carlos; Posada, Eduardo; Loya Constructors Inc

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) filed by DiDonato, Allen Jr.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 152]

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee (Rec & Order Regarding CMO Timeline; Summary of Deadlines and Case Dates (SIGNED AS MODIFIED)) filed by Roberts, James A.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by Bachman Flats LLC.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Bachman Flats LLC. Refers to: Loya Constructors Inc

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The OSC - Non-Sanction was rescheduled to 11/30/2018 at 11:00:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Clerks Certificate of Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Electronic Service (Notice to Filing Party RE Case Managment Order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Answer

Answer filed by Bachman Flats LLC.

Answer

Answer filed by Bachman Flats LLC.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 08/04/2017 at 09:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 11/03/2017 at 09:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Brennan J. Mitch in support of Bachman Flats, LLC Request for Commission to Issue Third Party Subpoena Outside California and supporting Application) filed by Bachman Flats LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/06/2016 10:00:00 AM.

Reply to Opposition - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Di Donato, Allen Jr.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Bachman Flats LLC; Vilenski, Benjamin.

175 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 276]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 01/04/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • OSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 01/04/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Christopher Hagen in Support of Motion for Entry of Judgment Per CCP 664.6 and an Award of Attorneys Fees) filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
245 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association; Bachman Flats Homeowners Association; Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Refers to: Bachman Flats LLC Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Original Summons filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Refers to: Bachman Flats LLC Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • [A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Refers to: Bachman Flats LLC Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Bachman Flats Homeowners Association. Refers to: Bachman Flats LLC; Vilenski, Benjamin; Ruvalcaba, Carlos; Posada, Eduardo; Loya Constructors Inc Filed By: Bachman Flats Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.