Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 11:35:06 (UTC).

Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust vs Wicomb

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Wicomb. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy Taylor and Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy Taylor

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust

Defendants

AASJ Inc

Gomez, P Daniela

Wicomb, Erin

Mavrik Capital Partners LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillips, Frederick C

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Ex-Parte Application for Order Advancing Hearing Date on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by AASJ Inc.

Declaration of Adam Davalos In Support of Ex-Parte Application for Order Advancing Hearing date on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens

Declaration - Other (DECLARATION OF ADAM DAVALOS) filed by AASJ Inc.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by AASJ Inc received but not filed on 04/21/2021.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by AASJ Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/22/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered as to Mavrik Capital Partners LLC) filed by Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust. Refers to: Wicomb, Erin; Gomez, P; AASJ Inc; Mavrik Capital Partners LLC

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/05/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 03/05/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust. Refers to: Wicomb, Erin

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust. Refers to: Mavrik Capital Partners LLC

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust. Refers to: Wicomb, Erin; Gomez, P; Mavrik Capital Partners LLC

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Wicomb, Erin; Gomez, P; Mavrik Capital Partners LLC

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 18]

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Kenneth Medel effective 03/05/2020

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketThe Ex-parte application was granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 09:30AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed continued pursuant to party's motion to 06/04/2021 at 09:30AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/22/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by AASJ Inc. Filed By: AASJ Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by AASJ Inc. Filed By: AASJ Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (DECLARATION OF ADAM DAVALOS) filed by AASJ Inc. Filed By: AASJ Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by AASJ Inc received but not filed on 04/21/2021. Filed By: AASJ Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Kenneth Medel effective 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/30/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust. Filed By: Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust. Refers to: Wicomb, Erin; Gomez, P; Mavrik Capital Partners LLC; AASJ Inc Filed By: Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust. Refers to: Wicomb, Erin; Gomez, P; Mavrik Capital Partners LLC; AASJ Inc Filed By: Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust. Refers to: Wicomb, Erin; Gomez, P; Mavrik Capital Partners LLC; AASJ Inc Filed By: Babak Navabi as Trustee of the Babak Navabi Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillips, Frederick C