Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/22/2020 at 08:13:28 (UTC).

B and B #3 Investments LLC vs Shaw

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 B and B 3 Investments LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Shaw. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B and B #3 Investments LLC

Defendants

Shaw, Frederick

Clark, Davondra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alter, Richard C

Defendant Attorney

Vakili, Jody

Attorney at LEGAL AID SOCIETY OF SAN DIEGO INC

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Clark, Davondra.

Post-Disposition Order on Court Fee Waiver

Post-Disposition Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Clark, Davondra.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/05/2020 01:15:00 PM.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing

Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 1-24-2020) filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra

Proof of service by Posting(UD)

Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Clark, Davondra

Proof of service by Posting(UD)

Proof of service by Posting(UD) (Frederick Shaw) filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (and Unknowns) filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and Unknowns) filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra

Writ of Possession issued.

Writ of Possession issued.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Clark, Davondra. Filed By: Clark, Davondra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketPost-Disposition Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Clark, Davondra. Filed By: Clark, Davondra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPost-Disposition Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Clark, Davondra. Filed By: Clark, Davondra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketLockout stayed until 05/26/2020 at midnight.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/05/2020 01:15:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 05/05/2020 at 01:15:00 PM at Central in C-60 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and Unknowns) filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra Filed By: B and B #3 Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for B and B #3 Investments LLC and against Clark, Davondra ;Shaw, Frederick for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service by Posting(UD) filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Clark, Davondra Filed By: B and B #3 Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Unknowns) filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra Filed By: B and B #3 Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Shaw, Frederick on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Clark, Davondra on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 1-24-2020) filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra Filed By: B and B #3 Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra Filed By: B and B #3 Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra Filed By: B and B #3 Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by B and B #3 Investments LLC. Refers to: Shaw, Frederick; Clark, Davondra Filed By: B and B #3 Investments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less