Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 06:52:01 (UTC).

AW Costa Fina LLC VS Fussell

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 AW Costa Fina LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Fussell. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aw Costa Fina LLC

Defendants

Depew, Sarah E

Fussell, Dana K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Eduardo

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/22/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/20/2020 08:35:00 AM.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (to Defendant Dana K Fussel to Appear at Trial) filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 12/14/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 08:35:00 AM at Central in C-60 was vacated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Refers to: Fussell, Dana; Depew, Sarah

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Refers to: Fussell, Dana; Depew, Sarah

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Refers to: Fussell, Dana; Depew, Sarah

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Sarah E Depew ONLY) filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (granted in whole) filed by Fussell, Dana K.

Answer

Answer filed by Fussell, Dana K.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (RE CONVERSION OF ACTION FROM UD TO GENERAL CIVIL AND ORDER SIGNED 02/19/2020) filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 08:35:00 AM at Central in C-60 .

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 12/14/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (to Defendant Dana K Fussel to Appear at Trial) filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Filed By: Aw Costa Fina LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Court Trial scheduled for 12/14/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/20/2020 08:35:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail (CMC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Fussell, Dana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 11/20/2020 at 08:35AM in Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/22/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Filed By: Aw Costa Fina LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Fussell, Dana K. Filed By: Fussell, Dana K (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Sarah E Depew ONLY) filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Filed By: Aw Costa Fina LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Filed By: Aw Costa Fina LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Depew, Sarah E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Refers to: Fussell, Dana; Depew, Sarah Filed By: Aw Costa Fina LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Refers to: Fussell, Dana; Depew, Sarah Filed By: Aw Costa Fina LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Aw Costa Fina LLC. Refers to: Fussell, Dana; Depew, Sarah Filed By: Aw Costa Fina LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA, EDUARDO