This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 07:01:19 (UTC).

Avendano vs Macias

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Avendano filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Macias. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Avendano, Angela

San Diego, CA 92114

Respondent

Macias, Erick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-61; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence (AND AFFIDAVIT OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE) filed by Avendano, Angela. Refers to: Macias, Erick; Filed By: Avendano, Angela (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (AMENDED) filed by Avendano, Angela.; Filed By: Avendano, Angela (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/21/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 04/20/2023 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Avendano, Angela.; Filed By: Avendano, Angela (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketInterpreter Request (Spanish) filed by Avendano, Angela.; Filed By: Avendano, Angela (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Avendano, Angela.; Filed By: Avendano, Angela (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Avendano, Angela.; Filed By: Avendano, Angela (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Avendano, Angela.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Avendano, Angela.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less