This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/23/2018 at 09:15:59 (UTC).

Avan Hassan vs. Marcia B Prim

Case Summary

On 01/25/2012 Avan Hassan filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Marcia B Prim. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-EC

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HASSAN, DEELAN

HASSAN, AVAN

Defendant

PRIM, MARCIA B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKHAEL, SIMON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SIMON MIKHAEL

1060 Vale Terrace Dr

Vista, CA 92084

Defendant Attorney

GRANT, DANNY R

Attorney at STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

P O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2012 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Hassan, Avan; Hassan, Deelan. Refers to: Prim, Marcia

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/27/2012 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2012
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hassan, Avan; Hassan, Deelan. Filed By: Hassan, Avan (Plaintiff); Hassan, Deelan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/25/2013 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by STREET, JAMES W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Status of Mediation process changed to Pending on 07/27/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/27/2012 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • This matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • Jury demanded by Defense.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2012
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Prim, Marcia B. Filed By: Prim, Marcia B (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2012 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • Answer filed by Prim, Marcia B. Filed By: Prim, Marcia B (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • Certificate of Progress: Stay for Uninsured/underinsured motorist claim filed by Hassan, Avan. Filed By: Hassan, Avan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hassan, Avan; Hassan, Deelan. Refers to: Prim, Marcia Filed By: Hassan, Avan (Plaintiff); Hassan, Deelan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Original Summons filed by Hassan, Avan; Hassan, Deelan. Refers to: Prim, Marcia Filed By: Hassan, Avan (Plaintiff); Hassan, Deelan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Complaint filed by Hassan, Avan; Hassan, Deelan. Refers to: Prim, Marcia Filed By: Hassan, Avan (Plaintiff); Hassan, Deelan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.