This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 13:28:39 (UTC).

Augustyn vs Chavez

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Augustyn filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Chavez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Augustyn, Guadalupe

Augustyn, Gerry

Defendants

Chavez, Hugo Edward

Nexlevel Builders Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Jorge C

Attorney at GONZALEZ & GARCIA APC

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (by Gerry Augustyn) filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (by Guadalupe Augustyn) filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe.

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe.

Request for Entry of Default

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc

in Support of Request for Default Court Judgment

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Request for Default Court Judgment) filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe.

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 23]

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

[Another document for ROA# 23]

Request for Dismissal of Does

[Another document for ROA# 23]

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

[Another document for ROA# 23]

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

[Another document for ROA# 23]

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Augustyn, Guadalupe; Augustyn, Gerry. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Augustyn, Guadalupe; Augustyn, Gerry. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court submitted by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe rejected on 03/18/2021. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc Filed By: Augustyn, Gerry (Plaintiff); Augustyn, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 23]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 23]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 23]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 23]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 23]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 23]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 23]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc Filed By: Augustyn, Gerry (Plaintiff); Augustyn, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe. Refers to: Nexlevel Builders Inc Filed By: Augustyn, Gerry (Plaintiff); Augustyn, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Augustyn, Gerry; Augustyn, Guadalupe. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo Filed By: Augustyn, Gerry (Plaintiff); Augustyn, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Augustyn, Guadalupe; Augustyn, Gerry. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc Filed By: Augustyn, Guadalupe (Plaintiff); Augustyn, Gerry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Augustyn, Guadalupe; Augustyn, Gerry. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc Filed By: Augustyn, Guadalupe (Plaintiff); Augustyn, Gerry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Augustyn, Guadalupe; Augustyn, Gerry. Refers to: Chavez, Hugo; Nexlevel Builders Inc Filed By: Augustyn, Guadalupe (Plaintiff); Augustyn, Gerry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ JORGE CARLOS