This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/09/2018 at 05:01:48 (UTC).

ATM Plus, Inc vs. A & P Locke, Inc

Case Summary

On 10/16/2009 ATM Plus, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A P Locke, Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATM PLUS INC; DBA : FAST UNDERCAR-CHULA VISTA

Defendants

LOCKE, ALEX

A & P LOCKE CORPORATION; DBA : BRAKE DEPOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMEY, CHRISTOPHER L

Attorney at RAMEY & PERRY APC

3838 N Camino Del Rio North 120

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 05/10/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 07/20/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 06/08/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed was rescheduled to 06/22/2012 at 10:30:00 AM in S-07 before Kenneth J Medel at South County.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 07/20/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service heard 06/08/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Judgment heard 05/10/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to A & P Locke Corporation on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by ATM Plus Inc .

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/10/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 06/22/2012 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 06/22/2012 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 06/22/2012 at 10:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • The OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed was rescheduled to 06/22/2012 at 10:30:00 AM in S-07 before Kenneth J Medel at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Judgment heard 05/10/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 06/08/2012 at 10:30AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 05/10/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • The default filed by ATM Plus Inc was entered as to A & P Locke Corporation on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by ATM Plus Inc. Refers to: A & P Locke Corporation Filed By: ATM Plus Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/10/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • The Ex Parte Application for an Order of Substituted Service of Process Through the Secretary of State's Office was GRANTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 03/10/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • The Ex Parte was rescheduled to 03/10/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in S-04 before William S. Cannon at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 03/08/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Original Summons filed by ATM Plus, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ATM Plus, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by ATM Plus, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.