This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/22/2018 at 21:18:33 (UTC).

Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company vs Vilter Manufacturing LLC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2013 Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Vilter Manufacturing LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH F. HAYES. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH F. HAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company

BIOFUELS POINT LOMA LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Stearns Conrad and Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; DBA : SCS Energy

Neal Electric Corporation

General Electric Company; DBA : GE

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

VILTER MANUFACTURING LLC; ESA : VMC MANUFACTURING LLC

KUPPER ENGINEERING INC

DVL Incorporated

VMC MANUFACTURING LLC; DBA : VILTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tolbert, Ned E

501 West Broadway Suite 1610

San Diego, CA 92101

PETRAY, ANDREA L

Attorney at FINCH THORNTON & BAIRD LLP

La Jolla Commons, 4747 Executive Dr #700

San Diego, CA 92121

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Ward, Garth N

HAUGHEY, CHARLES S JR

701 B Street 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Strong, David L

Attorney at MENEKSHE LAW FIRM

950 E Campbell Ave

Campbell, CA 95008

COOPER, THOMAS G

Attorney at SMITH DUGGAN

55 Old Bedford Rd

Lincoln, MA 01773-1125

HARRIS, MARC S

The Caledison, 601 W 5Th St 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

LOWDER, AMOS A

Attorney at SCHEPER KIM & HARRIS LLP

The Caledison, 601 W 5Th St 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2025

Millier, Jennifer M.

4640 Admiralty Way # 850

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

FRANCO, HOWARD JR

Attorney at COLLINS COLLINS MUIR & STEWART LLP

2011 Palomar Airport Road Suite 207

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Scherk, Robert M

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

750 B Street 2550

San Diego, CA 92101-8114

VRANJES, MARK

 

Court Documents

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (memorandum of points and authorities to Motion for Summary Adjudication) filed by DVL Incorporated.

Objections

Objections (to evidence in support of oppositiion to Motion for Summary Adjudication) filed by DVL Incorporated.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Notice of Lodgment (OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) submitted by DVL Incorporated rejected on 04/05/2016.

Order

Order (Court of Appeal order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Statement of Undisputed Facts

Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Neal Electric Corporation.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Neal Electric Corporation.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Neal Electric Corporation.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Neal Electric Corporation.

Order - Other

Order - Other filed by Neal Electric Corporation.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (of exhibits in support of oppositiion to Motion for Summary Adjudication) filed by DVL Incorporated.

Reply to Neal's Opposition to MSA - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other (Reply to Neal's Opposition to MSA - Other) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Supplemental Declaration ISO Reply to Neal's Opposition - Other

Declaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration ISO Reply to Neal's Opposition - Other) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Supplemental Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits ISO Reply to Neal's Opposition

Notice of Lodgment (Supplemental Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits ISO Reply to Neal's Opposition) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Reply to Neal's Separate Statement

Reply (Reply to Neal's Separate Statement) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Proof of Service re SCS Energy's Reply to Neal's Opposition to MSA

Proof of Service filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Reply to DVL's Opposition to MSA - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other (Reply to DVL's Opposition to MSA - Other) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Supplemental Declaration in Support of Reply to DVL's Opposition - Other

Declaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration in Support of Reply to DVL's Opposition - Other) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

Supplemental Notice of Lodgment ISO Reply to DVL's Opposition - Other

Notice - Other (Supplemental Notice of Lodgment ISO Reply to DVL's Opposition - Other) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc.

391 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: DVL Incorporated Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (VILTER MANUFACTURING LLC) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Vilter Manufacturing LLC. Filed By: Vilter Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc. Refers to: DVL Incorporated Filed By: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Vilter Manufacturing LLC. Filed By: Vilter Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Vilter Manufacturing LLC. Filed By: Vilter Manufacturing LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/24/2017 09:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Neal Electric Corporation. Filed By: Neal Electric Corporation (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
540 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc Filed By: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Vilter Manufacturing LLC; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc Filed By: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Refers to: Vilter Manufacturing LLC; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc; Kupper Engineering Inc Filed By: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/20/2013 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Onebeacon Insurance Company. Refers to: Vilter Manufacturing LLC; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc Filed By: Onebeacon Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Onebeacon Insurance Company. Refers to: Vilter Manufacturing LLC; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc Filed By: Onebeacon Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Onebeacon Insurance Company. Refers to: Vilter Manufacturing LLC; Stearns Conrad And Schmidt Consulting Engineers Inc Filed By: Onebeacon Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDT CONSULTING is a litigant

Latest cases where NEAL ELECTRIC CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA NEALELECTRIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant