This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/04/2019 at 04:41:01 (UTC).

Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. vs. Ralph J Riehl

Case Summary

On 06/05/2009 Atlantic Credit Finance Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ralph J Riehl. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC

Defendant

RIEHL, RALPH J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHN, GEORGE L

2850 Artesia Blvd

Redondo Beach, CA 90278

MERRILL, ANN K

Po Box 21667

Concord, CA 94521

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 17]

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution submitted by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc received but not filed on 10/13/2017.

Substitution of Attorney

[Another document for ROA# 17]

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc.

Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 1 of 1

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution submitted by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc received but not filed on 10/13/2017. Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 17]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 17]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc. Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2010
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc.. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc.. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • Location changed from shelf to clerks judg desk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Certificate of Service filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc.. Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc.. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc.. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc.. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc.. Refers to: Riehl, Ralph Filed By: Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.