This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 08:52:48 (UTC).

Atighi vs Select Portfolio Services

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Atighi filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Select Portfolio Services. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atighi, Andy

Defendants

Select Portfolio Services

Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation

Doherty, Timothy M

DLJ Mortgage

Caliber Home Loans Inc

GRP Financial Services Corp.

WMC Mortgage Corporation

 

Court Documents

Demurrer (Motions)

Demurrer ([7/09/2021]) filed by Caliber Home Loans Inc.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Aaron R. Goldstein in Support of Demurrer [7/9/2021]) filed by Caliber Home Loans Inc.

Request for Judicial Notice (Requests)

Request for Judicial Notice ([7/9/2021]) filed by Caliber Home Loans Inc.

Proposed Order (Motions)

Proposed Order filed by Caliber Home Loans Inc.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (7/9/21) filed by Atighi, Andy.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Andy Atighi/Additional Exhibits [5/7/2021]) filed by Atighi, Andy.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (additional exihibits in support of plaintiff) filed by Atighi, Andy.

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Atighi, Andy.

Motion - Other

Motion - Other (Motion for Lis Pendens [5/7/2021]) filed by Atighi, Andy.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Atighi, Andy. Refers to: Select Portfolio Services; GRP Financial Services Corp.; Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation; WMC Mortgage Corporation; DLJ Mortgage; Doherty, Timothy; Caliber Home Loans Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Atighi, Andy. Refers to: Select Portfolio Services; GRP Financial Services Corp.; Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation; WMC Mortgage Corporation; DLJ Mortgage; Doherty, Timothy; Caliber Home Loans Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Atighi, Andy. Refers to: Select Portfolio Services; GRP Financial Services Corp.; Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation; WMC Mortgage Corporation; DLJ Mortgage; Doherty, Timothy; Caliber Home Loans Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (additional exihibits in support of plaintiff) filed by Atighi, Andy. Filed By: Atighi, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Andy Atighi/Additional Exhibits [5/7/2021]) filed by Atighi, Andy. Filed By: Atighi, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (7/9/21) filed by Atighi, Andy. Filed By: Atighi, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer ([7/09/2021]) filed by Caliber Home Loans Inc. Filed By: Caliber Home Loans Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Aaron R. Goldstein in Support of Demurrer [7/9/2021]) filed by Caliber Home Loans Inc. Filed By: Caliber Home Loans Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice ([7/9/2021]) filed by Caliber Home Loans Inc. Filed By: Caliber Home Loans Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Other (Motion for Lis Pendens [5/7/2021]) filed by Atighi, Andy. Filed By: Atighi, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by Atighi, Andy. Filed By: Atighi, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/23/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by Atighi, Andy. Filed By: Atighi, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Atighi, Andy. Refers to: Select Portfolio Services; GRP Financial Services Corp.; Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation; WMC Mortgage Corporation; DLJ Mortgage; Doherty, Timothy; Caliber Home Loans Inc Filed By: Atighi, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Atighi, Andy. Refers to: Select Portfolio Services; GRP Financial Services Corp.; Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation; WMC Mortgage Corporation; DLJ Mortgage; Doherty, Timothy; Caliber Home Loans Inc Filed By: Atighi, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Atighi, Andy. Refers to: Select Portfolio Services; GRP Financial Services Corp.; Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation; WMC Mortgage Corporation; DLJ Mortgage; Doherty, Timothy; Caliber Home Loans Inc Filed By: Atighi, Andy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. by Caliber Home Loans Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WMC MORTGAGE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE LLC is a litigant