This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/12/2022 at 21:26:14 (UTC).

Ashley Singer vs M A C Cosmetics Inc

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Ashley Singer filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against M A C Cosmetics Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kobbervig, Jill

Kaholokula, Kellian

Juarez, Niza

Monteon, Janet

Singer, Ashley

Deguchy, Mercedes

Defendant

MAC COSMETICS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KHOURY, DIANA M

LATTIN, JOHN E

Manus, Marta

Mauro, Gregory

PONGRACZ, ANDREW C

Patterson, James R

Singer, Michael D.

Defendant Attorney

Le, Kathy A

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Service on Interested Parties Re: Declaration of Nathalie Hernandez of Ilym Group, Inc. Regarding Disbursement of Settlement Funds

Proof of Service filed by Singer, Ashley; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Declaration of Nathalie Hernandez of Ilym Group, Inc. Regarding Disbursement of Settlement Funds

Declaration - Other filed by Singer, Ashley; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Declaration of Service

Proof of Service by Mail (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Notice of Entry of Order and Judgement Thereon Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Entering Judgment

Notice - Other (OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND JUDGMENT) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Judgment

Judgment (Order and Judgment Thereon Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Entering Judgment) filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Elizabeth Cesena, CSR#12266, (619-646-7503)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of: 1) Appearance of Diana M. Khoury as Counsel for Plaintiffs; and 2) Withdrawal of Marta Manus as Counsel for Plaintiffs

Notice of Appearance filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Declaration of Service

Proof of Service filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Stipulation and Proposed Order to Increase Page Limit of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order Signed 11/9/20) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza; MAC COSMETICS INC.

Declaration of Service

Proof of Service (motion, memorandum, declarations, proposed order) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Proposed Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Entering Judgment

Proposed Order (granting order on final approval of class action settlement and entering judgment) submitted by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza received but not filed on 11/06/2020.

Declaration of Andrew C. Pongracz in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

Declaration - Other (of Andrew C Pongracz in support of motion for final approval of class action settlement and attorney fees) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Declaration of James R. Patterson in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

Declaration - Other (of James R Patterson in support of motion for final approval of class action settlement and attorney fees) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Declaration of Rodney Mesriani in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

Declaration - Other (of Rodney Mesriani in support of motion for final approval of class action settlement and attorney fees) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

Declaration of Jonathan M. Lebe in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement

Declaration - Other (of Jonathan M Lebe in support of motion for order granting final approval of class action settlement) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Singer, Ashley; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff); Juarez, Niza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Singer, Ashley; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff); Juarez, Niza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND JUDGMENT) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Deguchy, Mercedes ;Juarez, Niza ;Kaholokula, Kellian ;Kobbervig, Jill ;Monteon, Janet ;Singer, Ashley and against MAC COSMETICS INC for $ 3940000.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 3940000.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment (Order and Judgment Thereon Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Entering Judgment) filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Elizabeth Cesena, CSR#12266, (619-646-7503)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to Gregory Pollack effective 07/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less