**********************-CTL
06/28/2019
Disposed - Judgment Entered
Labor - Other Labor
San Diego, California
Gregory W Pollack
Kobbervig, Jill
Kaholokula, Kellian
Juarez, Niza
Monteon, Janet
Singer, Ashley
Deguchy, Mercedes
MAC COSMETICS INC
LATTIN, JOHN E
Manus, Marta
Mauro, Gregory
PONGRACZ, ANDREW C
Patterson, James R
Singer, Michael D.
KHOURY, DIANA M
Le, Kathy A
Notice - Other (OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND JUDGMENT) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of motion for approval of class settlement) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Complaint filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC
Proof of Service filed by Singer, Ashley; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Declaration - Other filed by Singer, Ashley; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Proof of Service by Mail (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Judgment (Order and Judgment Thereon Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Entering Judgment) filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM.
Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Elizabeth Cesena, CSR#12266, (619-646-7503)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Notice of Appearance filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Proof of Service filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order Signed 11/9/20) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza; MAC COSMETICS INC.
Proof of Service (motion, memorandum, declarations, proposed order) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Proposed Order (granting order on final approval of class action settlement and entering judgment) submitted by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza received but not filed on 11/06/2020.
Declaration - Other (of Andrew C Pongracz in support of motion for final approval of class action settlement and attorney fees) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
Declaration - Other (of James R Patterson in support of motion for final approval of class action settlement and attorney fees) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.
DocketProof of Service filed by Singer, Ashley; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff); Juarez, Niza (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration - Other filed by Singer, Ashley; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff); Juarez, Niza (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Change of Firm Name filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service by Mail (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice - Other (OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND JUDGMENT) filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Deguchy, Mercedes ;Juarez, Niza ;Kaholokula, Kellian ;Kobbervig, Jill ;Monteon, Janet ;Singer, Ashley and against MAC COSMETICS INC for $ 3940000.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 3940000.00.
[-] Read LessDocketJudgment (Order and Judgment Thereon Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Entering Judgment) filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
[-] Read LessDocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Elizabeth Cesena, CSR#12266, (619-646-7503)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.
[-] Read LessDocketCase reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to Gregory Pollack effective 07/08/2019
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.
[-] Read LessDocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Singer, Ashley; Monteon, Janet; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza.; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketCase initiation form printed.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.
[-] Read LessDocketOriginal Summons filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint filed by Singer, Ashley; Kobbervig, Jill; Kaholokula, Kellian; Monteon, Janet; Deguchy, Mercedes; Juarez, Niza. Refers to: MAC COSMETICS INC; Filed By: Singer, Ashley (Plaintiff); Kobbervig, Jill (Plaintiff); Kaholokula, Kellian (Plaintiff); Monteon, Janet (Plaintiff); Deguchy, Mercedes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read Less