This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/19/2022 at 01:38:46 (UTC).

Arvizu vs Select Portfolio Servicing Inc

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 Arvizu filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arvizu, Lita

Arvizu, Luis

Defendant

Select Portfolio Servicing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shapero, Sarah E

Attorney at SHAPERO LAW FIRM One Market Spear Tower

1 Market Spear Tower 36Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.

DECLARATION OF LITA ARVIZU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - Other (OF LITA ARVIZU) filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.

PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Reply filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.

Declaration of Diane Weinberger in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Declaration - Other filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.

Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.

[Proposed] Order

Proposed Order submitted by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis received but not filed on 03/29/2022.

DECLARATION OF LITA ARVIZU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration - Other (OF LITA ARVIZU) filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/24/2022 09:00:00 AM.

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Declaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration of Sarah Shapero) filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE TRUSTEES SALE

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 12]

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE TRUSTEES SALE

[Another document for ROA# 12]

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil) - Motion for Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.; Filed By: Arvizu, Lita (Plaintiff); Arvizu, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (OF LITA ARVIZU) filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.; Filed By: Arvizu, Lita (Plaintiff); Arvizu, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.; Filed By: Arvizu, Lita (Plaintiff); Arvizu, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.; Filed By: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.; Filed By: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.; Filed By: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.; Filed By: Arvizu, Lita (Plaintiff); Arvizu, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis received but not filed on 03/29/2022.; Filed By: Arvizu, Lita (Plaintiff); Arvizu, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (OF SARAH SHAPERO) filed by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis.; Filed By: Arvizu, Lita (Plaintiff); Arvizu, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Arvizu, Lita; Arvizu, Luis received but not filed on 03/23/2022.; Filed By: Arvizu, Lita (Plaintiff); Arvizu, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 03/24/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/26/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Arvizu, Luis; Arvizu, Lita. Refers to: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc; Filed By: Arvizu, Luis (Plaintiff); Arvizu, Lita (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPERO, SARAH E