This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 04:47:19 (UTC).

Arrow Financial Services LLC VS Stanley

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Arrow Financial Services LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Stanley. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arrow Financial Services LLC

Defendant

Stanley, Melissa

Assignee

LVNV Funding LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

Colclough, Robert J III

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J COLCLOUGH III

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC.

Assignment of Judgment (Enforcement Of Judgment)

Assignment of Judgment filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: LVNV Funding LLC

Writ of Execution (Enforcement Of Judgment)

Writ of Execution submitted by LVNV Funding LLC received but not filed on 03/03/2021.

Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry

Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Stanley, Melissa

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Stanley, Melissa

Sister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry

Sister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Stanley, Melissa

Sister-State Judgment

Sister-State Judgment filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Stanley, Melissa

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: LVNV Funding LLC Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution submitted by LVNV Funding LLC received but not filed on 03/03/2021. Filed By: LVNV Funding LLC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Stanley, Melissa Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Arrow Financial Services LLC and against Stanley, Melissa for $ 1423.48, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 1021.03, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 2444.51.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Stanley, Melissa; LVNV Funding LLC Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Stanley, Melissa Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Stanley, Melissa Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. COLCLOUGH III