This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 06:34:26 (UTC).

Arrow Financial Services LLC vs. Herbert Meyer

Case Summary

On 03/30/2010 Arrow Financial Services LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Herbert Meyer. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendant

MEYER, HERBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNARD, ROBERT SCOTT

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

Harvard St

Sacramento, CA 95815

Defendant Attorneys

ROONEY, CLINTON

Attorney at ROONEY & LICKEL

1102 Cesar E. Chavez Pkwy

San Diego, CA 92113

RECORDON, STEPHEN G

225 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Meyer, Herbert on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC .

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/07/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/07/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for heard 04/06/2011 02:29:00 PM.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2011
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal (and Proof of Service) filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for heard 04/06/2011 02:29:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • Civil Court Trial scheduled for 04/07/2011 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • Notice - Other (OF SUBPOENA TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE BEFORE THE COURT AND TO PRODUCE BOOKS, DOCUMENT AND OTHER THINGS) filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/07/2011 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • Civil Court Trial scheduled for 04/07/2011 at 09:00AM before Judge William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/07/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2010
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • Answer filed by Meyer, Herbert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • File on clerks judg desk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Meyer, Herbert Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Meyer, Herbert Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Meyer, Herbert Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Meyer, Herbert Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC. Refers to: Meyer, Herbert Filed By: Arrow Financial Services LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.