This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/10/2019 at 06:45:39 (UTC).

Aron Gonzalez vs. Wayne Green

Case Summary

On 11/08/2010 Aron Gonzalez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Wayne Green. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ, ARON

BLANCO, LIBBY

Defendants

ZAMARRIPA, LORI

GREEN, KEVIN

GREEN, WAYNE

SUNSET VILLAS

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial submitted by Blanco, Libby; Gonzalez, Aron rejected on 12/04/2010. Refers to: Green, Kevin; Green, Wayne; Sunset Villas; Zamarripa, Lori

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 02/02/2011 at 01:30:00 PM in S-05 before at South County.

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant SD

Request for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial filed by Gonzalez, Aron; Blanco, Libby. Refers to: Green, Wayne; Zamarripa, Lori; Sunset Villas; Green, Kevin

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 03/09/2011 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Gonzalez, Aron, on 04/08/2011, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment (Denied) filed by Gonzalez, Aron; Blanco, Libby. Refers to: Green, Wayne; Zamarripa, Lori; Sunset Villas; Green, Kevin Filed By: Gonzalez, Aron (Plaintiff); Blanco, Libby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Gonzalez, Aron. Filed By: Gonzalez, Aron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • Amended Notice of Entry of Judgment showing complete address of plaintiff, Aron Gonzalez mailed to all parties on 03/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Sunset Villas; Green, Kevin; Green, Wayne. Filed By: Sunset Villas (Defendant); Green, Kevin (Defendant); Green, Wayne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 03/09/2011 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2011
  • Small Claims Court Trial reassigned to for 02/02/2011 at 01:30:00 PM in S-02 at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial filed by Gonzalez, Aron; Blanco, Libby. Refers to: Green, Wayne; Zamarripa, Lori; Sunset Villas; Green, Kevin Filed By: Gonzalez, Aron (Plaintiff); Blanco, Libby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 02/02/2011 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 02/02/2011 at 01:30:00 PM in S-05 before at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial submitted by Blanco, Libby; Gonzalez, Aron rejected on 12/04/2010. Refers to: Green, Kevin; Green, Wayne; Sunset Villas; Zamarripa, Lori Filed By: Blanco, Libby (Plaintiff); Gonzalez, Aron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 12/15/2010 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • Case assigned to Department S-01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • Declaration - Other filed by Gonzalez, Aron; Blanco, Libby. Refers to: Green, Wayne; Zamarripa, Lori; Sunset Villas; Green, Kevin Filed By: Gonzalez, Aron (Plaintiff); Blanco, Libby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Gonzalez, Aron; Blanco, Libby. Refers to: Green, Wayne; Zamarripa, Lori; Sunset Villas; Green, Kevin Filed By: Gonzalez, Aron (Plaintiff); Blanco, Libby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.