This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 07:01:40 (UTC).

Armando Diaz vs. Carmencita Luna

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Armando Diaz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Carmencita Luna. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Diaz, Armando

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Respondent

Luna, Carmencita

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Diaz, Armando. Refers to: Luna, Carmencita; Filed By: Diaz, Armando (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/14/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketRestraining order as requested against Carmencita Luna was granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Diaz, Armando. Refers to: Luna, Carmencita; Filed By: Diaz, Armando (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Diaz, Armando. Refers to: Luna, Carmencita; Filed By: Diaz, Armando (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-07 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Diaz, Armando. Refers to: Luna, Carmencita; Filed By: Diaz, Armando (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketInterpreter Request (SPANISH) filed by Diaz, Armando. Refers to: Luna, Carmencita; Filed By: Diaz, Armando (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department S-07.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Diaz, Armando. Refers to: Luna, Carmencita; Filed By: Diaz, Armando (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diaz, Armando. Refers to: Luna, Carmencita; Campa, Wendy; Diaz Jr, Armando; Diaz, Aaliyah; Filed By: Diaz, Armando (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Diaz, Armando. Refers to: Luna, Carmencita; Campa, Wendy; Diaz Jr, Armando; Diaz, Aaliyah; Filed By: Diaz, Armando (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less