This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/10/2020 at 01:16:49 (UTC).

APODACA vs BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 APODACA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APODACA, MICHAEL

Defendants

Brecht Enterprises Inc; DBA : BMW of Escondido

BMW of North America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mikhov, Steve B

Attorney at KNIGHT LAW GROUP LLP

Defendant Attorney

Dixon, Robert K

Attorney at WILSON TURNER KOSMO LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterprises Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterprises Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterprises Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterprises Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC

Answer

Answer filed by BMW of North America LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: Brecht Enterprises Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: Brecht Enterprises Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Brecht Enterprises Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/08/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Brecht Enterprises Inc. Filed By: Brecht Enterprises Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: Brecht Enterprises Inc Filed By: APODACA, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: Brecht Enterprises Inc Filed By: APODACA, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by BMW of North America LLC. Filed By: BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC Filed By: APODACA, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/08/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterprises Inc Filed By: APODACA, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterprises Inc Filed By: APODACA, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterprises Inc Filed By: APODACA, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by APODACA, MICHAEL. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterprises Inc Filed By: APODACA, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brecht Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIXON ROBERT K