This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/28/2019 at 02:16:22 (UTC).

Antonio vs BMW Of North America LLC

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 Antonio filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW Of North America LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTONIO, FRANCISCO JAVIER

MEZA, PALOMINO

Defendants

BRECHT ENTERPRIES INC; DBA : MINI OF ESCONDIDO

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVASZ, CHRISTOPHER M

Attorney at CONSUMER LEGAL SERVICES PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Defendant Attorneys

CELENTINO, CHRISTOPHER

655 West Broadway #800

San Diego, CA 92101

Lehrman, Kate

12121 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Antonio, Francisco Javier; Meza, Palomino. Refers to: Brecht Enterpries INC

Notice of Taking Motion to Compel Arbitration Off Calendar

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR) filed by BMW of North America LLC.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action of Defendant Mini of Escondido; Declaration of Andrew K. Stefatos

Motion - Other (05/31/2019) filed by Brecht Enterpries INC.

Declaration Thomas Brecht ISO MTC-Arbitration

Declaration - Other (05/31/2019) filed by Brecht Enterpries INC.

Notice of Consent to Arbitrate

Notice - Other (05/31/2019) filed by Brecht Enterpries INC.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (05/31/2019) filed by Brecht Enterpries INC.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 21]

Notice of Consent to Arbitrate

[Another document for ROA# 21]

Declaration Thomas Brecht ISO MTC-Arbitration

[Another document for ROA# 21]

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action of Defendant Mini of Escondido; Declaration of Andrew K. Stefatos

[Another document for ROA# 21]

Proposed Order

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Brecht Enterprises Inc, dba Mini of Escondido's Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Brecht Enterpries INC.

BMW of North America's Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by BMW of North America LLC.

Brecht Enterprises dba Mini of Escondido's Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Brecht Enterpries INC.

Answer

Answer filed by Brecht Enterpries INC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Brecht Enterpries INC.

Answer

Answer filed by BMW of North America LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by BMW of North America LLC.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR) filed by BMW of North America LLC. Filed By: BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Antonio, Francisco Javier; Meza, Palomino. Refers to: Brecht Enterpries INC Filed By: Antonio, Francisco Javier (Plaintiff); Meza, Palomino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Brecht Enterpries INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 21]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 21]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 21]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 21]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order (05/31/2019) filed by Brecht Enterpries INC. Filed By: Brecht Enterpries INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by BMW of North America LLC. Filed By: BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by BMW of North America LLC. Filed By: BMW of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Antonio, Francisco Javier; Meza, Palomino. Refers to: Brecht Enterpries INC Filed By: Antonio, Francisco Javier (Plaintiff); Meza, Palomino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Antonio, Francisco Javier. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC Filed By: Antonio, Francisco Javier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Antonio, Francisco Javier; Meza, Palomino. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterpries INC Filed By: Antonio, Francisco Javier (Plaintiff); Meza, Palomino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Antonio, Francisco Javier; Meza, Palomino. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterpries INC Filed By: Antonio, Francisco Javier (Plaintiff); Meza, Palomino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Antonio, Francisco Javier; Meza, Palomino. Refers to: BMW of North America LLC; Brecht Enterpries INC Filed By: Antonio, Francisco Javier (Plaintiff); Meza, Palomino (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brecht Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER