This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 13:09:48 (UTC).

Ang VS Stalker

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Ang filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Stalker. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ang, Evelyn

Defendants

Lee Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust

ETHERTON, BRUCE

Just Star Construction Inc

Lisa Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust

Stalker, Lisa

Stalker, Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walshok, Colin H

Attorney at WINGERT GREBING BRUBAKER & JUSKIE LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Nelson, Victoria J.

Attorney at BLUMBERG LAW GROUP LLP

Grosfeld, Robert

Attorney at JEFFREY & GROSFELD LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ang, Evelyn. Refers to: Stalker, Lee; Stalker, Lisa; Lee Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust; Just Star Construction Inc; ETHERTON, BRUCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ang, Evelyn. Refers to: Stalker, Lee; Stalker, Lisa; Lee Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust; Just Star Construction Inc; ETHERTON, BRUCE

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Substitution of Attorney for Just-Star Construction, Inc.

Substitution of Attorney filed by Just Star Construction Inc.

Substitution of Attorney for Lisa Stalker

Substitution of Attorney filed by Stalker, Lisa.

20201204 Answer

Answer filed by Just Star Construction Inc; Stalker, Lee; Lee Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust; Stalker, Lisa; Lisa Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Just Star Construction Inc. Filed By: Just Star Construction Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Stalker, Lisa. Filed By: Stalker, Lisa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Just Star Construction Inc; Stalker, Lee; Lee Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust; Stalker, Lisa; Lisa Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust. Filed By: Just Star Construction Inc (Defendant); Stalker, Lee (Defendant); Lee Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust (Defendant); Stalker, Lisa (Defendant); Lisa Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ang, Evelyn. Refers to: Stalker, Lee; Stalker, Lisa; Lee Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust; Just Star Construction Inc; ETHERTON, BRUCE; Lisa Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust Filed By: Ang, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ang, Evelyn. Refers to: Stalker, Lee; Stalker, Lisa; Lee Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust; Just Star Construction Inc; ETHERTON, BRUCE Filed By: Ang, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ang, Evelyn. Refers to: Stalker, Lee; Stalker, Lisa; Lee Stalker as Trustee of the Stalker Family Trust; Just Star Construction Inc; ETHERTON, BRUCE Filed By: Ang, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walshok, Colin H