This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/08/2018 at 12:17:51 (UTC).

ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC vs. PALOMAR HEALTH

Case Summary

On 09/16/2014 ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PALOMAR HEALTH. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC

Defendants

PALOMAR HEALTH

EMERALD TEXTILES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAPIN, EDWARD D

KNAIER, ROBERT G

COCHRAN, KEITH M

Defendant Attorneys

MORIARTY, MARILYN R

JENNETT, KRAIG D

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Refers to: PALOMAR HEALTH

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Refers to: PALOMAR HEALTH

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Refers to: PALOMAR HEALTH

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Palomar Health) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Refers to: PALOMAR HEALTH

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for Temporary Restraining Order) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Robert G Knaier Esq) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Beth Spiegel) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Gary Kessinger) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Jason Tharp) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Lew Belote) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Mark Kemp) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Robert McCann) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Re: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order) submitted by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC received but not filed on 09/30/2014.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

as to Angelica Textile Services Inc's Ex Parte

Proof of Service filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Katie Langgle # 8637) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/01/2014 08:30:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 32)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/16/2015

DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2015

DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2015

DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2015

DocketSummary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 11/20/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2015

DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/18/2015 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2015

DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 01/15/2016 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2015

DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to ANGELICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2015

DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Emerald Textiles LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2015

DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to PALOMAR HEALTH.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2015
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by ANGELICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Filed By: ANGELICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
09/30/2014
View Court Documents

DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for Temporary Restraining Order) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Filed By: ANGELICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2014
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Palomar Health) filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Refers to: PALOMAR HEALTH Filed By: ANGELICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2014

DocketEx Parte scheduled for 10/01/2014 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2014

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/06/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pressman, Joel.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2014

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Refers to: PALOMAR HEALTH Filed By: ANGELICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Refers to: PALOMAR HEALTH Filed By: ANGELICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by ANEGLICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC. Refers to: PALOMAR HEALTH Filed By: ANGELICA TEXTILE SERVICES INC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less