This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 08:16:58 (UTC).

Anderson vs Pacifica Senior Living-Vista

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Anderson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pacifica Senior Living-Vista. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON, DOROTHY

Defendants

Pacifica Senior Living-Vista

Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC; DBA : Seasons Hospice

Pacifica East Lake LLC; ESA : Pacifica Senior Living-Vista;DBA : Pacifica Senior Living Vista

Guardian Ad Litem

Castillo, Shirley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pick, Lukas

Attorney at PICK LAW

Defendant Attorneys

Burke, David

Trotter, Michael J

Attorney at CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN & MCKENNA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY.

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to request earlier hearing) filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (granting order on earlier hearing date) submitted by ANDERSON, DOROTHY received but not filed on 01/19/2021.

Answer

Answer filed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/21/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Preference

Opposition - Other (non opposition to plaintiff's motion for trial preference) filed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Pacifica East Lake LLC.

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (ORDER SIGNED ON 02/02/2021) filed by Castillo, Shirley. Refers to: ANDERSON, DOROTHY

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/04/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Lukas I Pick in support of motion for trial preference) filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of motion for trial preference) filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY.

Complaint

Complaint filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Refers to: Pacifica Senior Living-Vista; Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Refers to: Pacifica Senior Living-Vista; Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Refers to: Pacifica Senior Living-Vista; Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Filed By: ANDERSON, DOROTHY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/04/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - Other (non opposition to plaintiff's motion for trial preference) filed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC. Filed By: Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Pacifica East Lake LLC. Filed By: Pacifica East Lake LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (ORDER SIGNED ON 02/02/2021) filed by Castillo, Shirley. Refers to: ANDERSON, DOROTHY Filed By: Castillo, Shirley (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/04/2021 at 09:30AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/21/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to request earlier hearing) filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Filed By: ANDERSON, DOROTHY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of motion for trial preference) filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Filed By: ANDERSON, DOROTHY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (motion, declaration, memorandum) filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Filed By: ANDERSON, DOROTHY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Refers to: Pacifica East Lake LLC; Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC Filed By: ANDERSON, DOROTHY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Refers to: Pacifica East Lake LLC; Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC Filed By: ANDERSON, DOROTHY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by ANDERSON, DOROTHY. Refers to: Pacifica East Lake LLC; Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of California-San Diego LLC Filed By: ANDERSON, DOROTHY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEASON HOSPICE AND PALLIATIVE CARE OF BROWARD FL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pick, Lukas