This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:49:05 (UTC).

Anderson vs Mercedes-Benz USA LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Anderson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy Taylor and John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy Taylor

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anderson, Rachel

Defendant

Mercedes-Benz USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman, David L

Attorney at ROSNER BARRY & BABBITT LLP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Anderson, Rachel.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Anderson, Rachel.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to John Meyer effective 02/27/2020

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Anderson, Rachel.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Anderson, Rachel. Refers to: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Rachel. Refers to: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Anderson, Rachel. Refers to: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Anderson, Rachel. Filed By: Anderson, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Anderson, Rachel. Filed By: Anderson, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to John Meyer effective 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Anderson, Rachel. Filed By: Anderson, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Anderson, Rachel. Refers to: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC Filed By: Anderson, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Rachel. Refers to: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC Filed By: Anderson, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Anderson, Rachel. Refers to: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC Filed By: Anderson, Rachel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.