This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/18/2023 at 07:19:05 (UTC).

Anderson vs KIX Screening and Protection Services LLC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 Anderson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KIX Screening and Protection Services LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anderson, Cody M

Defendants

KIX Screening and Protection Services LLC

Walters, Christopher J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ghavimi, Aidin D

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: KIX Screening and Protection Services LLC; Walters, Christopher

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets) (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: KIX Screening and Protection Services LLC; Walters, Christopher

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: KIX Screening and Protection Services LLC; Walters, Christopher

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: Walters, Christopher

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: Walters, Christopher

 

Docket Entries

06/23/2023

HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: Walters, Christopher; Filed By: Anderson, Cody M (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: Walters, Christopher; Filed By: Anderson, Cody M (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2023

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: KIX Screening and Protection Services LLC; Walters, Christopher; Filed By: Anderson, Cody M (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: KIX Screening and Protection Services LLC; Walters, Christopher; Filed By: Anderson, Cody M (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Anderson, Cody M. Refers to: KIX Screening and Protection Services LLC; Walters, Christopher; Filed By: Anderson, Cody M (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less