This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 07:01:25 (UTC).

Anderson vs BURLINGTON STORE INC

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Anderson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURLINGTON STORE INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anderson, Sylvia

Defendants

BURLINGTON

BURLINGTON STORE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Steven

Attorney at GREEN LAW GROUP

4275 Executive Square Unit 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Anderson, Sylvia. Refers to: BURLINGTON STORE INC; BURLINGTON

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Sylvia. Refers to: BURLINGTON STORE INC; BURLINGTON

Complaint

Complaint filed by Anderson, Sylvia. Refers to: BURLINGTON STORE INC; BURLINGTON

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Anderson, Sylvia.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Anderson, Sylvia. Refers to: BURLINGTON STORE INC; BURLINGTON

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to BURLINGTON STORE INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to BURLINGTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Anderson, Sylvia .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Anderson, Sylvia. Refers to: BURLINGTON STORE INC; BURLINGTON Filed By: Anderson, Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Anderson, Sylvia. Filed By: Anderson, Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Anderson, Sylvia. Refers to: BURLINGTON STORE INC; BURLINGTON Filed By: Anderson, Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Sylvia. Refers to: BURLINGTON STORE INC; BURLINGTON Filed By: Anderson, Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Anderson, Sylvia. Refers to: BURLINGTON STORE INC; BURLINGTON Filed By: Anderson, Sylvia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant