This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/23/2018 at 11:55:48 (UTC).

ANABEL AGUILERA vs. GUSTAVO GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 12/29/2015 ANABEL AGUILERA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUSTAVO GONZALEZ. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILERA, ANABEL

Defendants

GONZALEZ, GUSTAVO ; DBA : PRO-MEX AUTOMOTIVE

MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 06/23/2016 at 01:00:00 PM in C-22 before at Central.

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant SD

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant SD generated.

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-22 to C-62 effective 01/12/2018.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 06/23/2016 01:00:00 PM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned from C-62 to C-63 effective 04/14/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from C-22 to C-62 effective 01/12/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 06/23/2016 01:00:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketThe Court finds judgment on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court for ANABEL AGUILERA and against GUSTAVO GONZALEZ, DBA PRO-MEX AUTOMOTIVE in the amount of: $3382.00 principal, $75.00 costs, $0 pre-judgment interest. Defendant Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC does not owe Plaintiff any money.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketOrder, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketRequest for Continuance of Small Claims Trial filed by AGUILERA, ANABEL. Refers to: GONZALEZ, GUSTAVO; MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC Filed By: AGUILERA, ANABEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 06/23/2016 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-22 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 06/23/2016 at 01:00:00 PM in C-22 before at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by AGUILERA, ANABEL. Refers to: GONZALEZ, GUSTAVO Filed By: AGUILERA, ANABEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk filed by AGUILERA, ANABEL. Refers to: MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC Filed By: AGUILERA, ANABEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 03/29/2016 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-22 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by AGUILERA, ANABEL. Refers to: GONZALEZ, GUSTAVO; MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC Filed By: AGUILERA, ANABEL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC is a litigant