This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 07:20:42 (UTC).

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES vs MADON

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MADON. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.; DBA : GM Financial

Defendant

Madon, Thomas S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ernest, Steven E

Attorney at COOKSEY TOOLEN GAGE DUFFY & WOOG

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas

Complaint

Complaint filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Original Summons

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Statement of Venue

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing

Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (12/17/2021) filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc..

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (12/17/2021) filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc..

Application for Writ of Possession

Application for Writ of Possession (12/17/2021) filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc..

Declaration in Support of Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration - Other (of Timothy January 12/17/2021) filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc..

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 15]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/25/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Madon, Thomas S. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas Filed By: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (12/17/2021) filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Filed By: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (12/17/2021) filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Filed By: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (12/17/2021) filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Filed By: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Timothy January 12/17/2021) filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Filed By: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas Filed By: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas Filed By: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas Filed By: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc.. Refers to: Madon, Thomas Filed By: AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERNEST STEVEN E