This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/26/2019 at 06:00:13 (UTC).

American Express Centurion Bank vs. Cavigliano

Case Summary

On 09/28/2012 American Express Centurion Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cavigliano. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express Centurion Bank

Defendant

Cavigliano, Gary E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bachman, Robert L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT L BACHMAN

19100 Von Karman Avenue 380

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by American Express Centurion Bank.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Wohlfeil,Joel to Sturgeon,Eddie effective 11/16/2012

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (as to Gary E. Cavigliano) filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does (DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE) filed by American Express Centurion Bank.

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents (APPROVED AS TO FORM ONLY) filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2013
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for American Express Centurion Bank and against Cavigliano, Gary E for $ 89602.12, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 501.95, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 90104.07.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents (APPROVED AS TO FORM ONLY) filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • **COURT Default and/or Judgment Papers Received**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does (DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE) filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • Default entered as to Cavigliano, Gary E on Complaint filed by American Express Centurion Bank .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default (as to Gary E. Cavigliano) filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • *** DEFAULT PAPERS RECEIVED ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Wohlfeil,Joel to Sturgeon,Eddie effective 11/16/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by American Express Centurion Bank. Refers to: Cavigliano, Gary Filed By: American Express Centurion Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less