This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/26/2019 at 05:54:45 (UTC).

American Express Bank FSB vs. Jones

Case Summary

On 06/06/2012 American Express Bank FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express Bank FSB

Defendants

Jones Jr, Dan ; AKA : Jones, Danny

RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael, Lina M

Attorney at MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

555 Saint Charles Drive 204

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by American Express Bank FSB.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by American Express Bank FSB.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan Filed By: American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED Filed By: American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED Filed By: American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for American Express Bank FSB and against Jones, Dan Jr;RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED for $ 20446.63, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 1800.00, interest: $ 229.60, prejudgment costs: $ 475.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 22951.23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by American Express Bank FSB.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by American Express Bank FSB.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by American Express Bank FSB.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by American Express Bank FSB.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED Filed By: American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan Filed By: American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by American Express Bank FSB. Filed By: American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED Filed By: American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Jones, Dan; RAYMERT PRESS INCORPORATED Filed By: American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less