This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 05:11:06 (UTC).

Alvarez vs Legoland California LLC

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 Alvarez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Legoland California LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litems and Plaintiffs

Alvarez, Lizette

Monge, Chloe

Defendants

Legoland California LLC

LegoLand California Resort LLC; ESA : Legoland California LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff Attorney

Ghermezian, Raymond

Attorney at RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

3435 Wilshire Blvd Suite #1800

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

Lewis, Rosemarie S

626 Wilshire Boulevard 975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe. Refers to: Legoland California LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe. Refers to: Legoland California LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe. Refers to: Legoland California LLC

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by LegoLand California Resort LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/22/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Reply (Opposition & Replies)

Reply (10/22/21) filed by LegoLand California Resort LLC.

Opposition - Other (Opposition & Replies)

Opposition - Other (Opposition to Motion to Reclassify as Limited Civil Jurisdiction Case [10/22/2021]) filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe.

Motion - Other (Motions)

Motion - Other (10/22/2021) filed by LegoLand California Resort LLC.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by LegoLand California Resort LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/04/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Alvarez, Lizette.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by LegoLand California Resort LLC.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/22/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply (10/22/21) filed by LegoLand California Resort LLC. Filed By: LegoLand California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - Other (Opposition to Motion to Reclassify as Limited Civil Jurisdiction Case [10/22/2021]) filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe. Filed By: Alvarez, Lizette (Plaintiff); Monge, Chloe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Other (10/22/2021) filed by LegoLand California Resort LLC. Filed By: LegoLand California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 09:15AM before Judge Earl H. Maas, III.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Alvarez, Lizette. Filed By: Alvarez, Lizette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by LegoLand California Resort LLC. Filed By: LegoLand California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe. Filed By: Alvarez, Lizette (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe. Refers to: LegoLand California Resort LLC Filed By: Alvarez, Lizette (Plaintiff); Monge, Chloe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe. Refers to: LegoLand California Resort LLC Filed By: Alvarez, Lizette (Plaintiff); Monge, Chloe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Alvarez, Lizette; Monge, Chloe. Refers to: LegoLand California Resort LLC Filed By: Alvarez, Lizette (Plaintiff); Monge, Chloe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS ROSEMARIE SUAZO