This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2018 at 03:36:13 (UTC).

Alsennawi vs. Finzi

Case Summary

On 08/21/2012 Alsennawi filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Finzi. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-EC

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alsennawi, Dina

Defendant

Finzi, Sharon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Savaglio, Barbara B

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BARBARA B SAVAGLIO

2727 Camino Del Rio South 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

GRANT, DANNY R

Attorney at STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

P O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Alsennawi, Dina. Refers to: Finzi, Sharon

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Alsennawi, Dina. Refers to: Finzi, Sharon

Statement of Damages

Statement of Damages filed by Alsennawi, Dina. Refers to: Finzi, Sharon

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Alsennawi, Dina. Refers to: Finzi, Sharon

Answer

Answer filed by Finzi, Sharon. Refers to: Alsennawi, Dina

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Alsennawi, Dina.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Alsennawi, Dina.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Finzi, Sharon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/03/2013 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (RE: CONTINUING OF MEDIATION CUT-OFF DATE AND REQUEST TO EXTEND THE APPOINTMENT OF DEBRA DOMINSKI) filed by Alsennawi, Dina; Finzi, Sharon.

Order - Other

Order - Other (RE: CONTINUING OF MEDIATION CUT-OFF DATE AND REQUEST TO EXTEND THE APPOINTMENT OF DEBRA DOMINSKI) filed by Finzi, Sharon. Refers to: Alsennawi, Dina

Notice of Reassignment of Mediator SD

Notice of Reassignment of Mediator SD generated.

Advance Trial Review Order

Advance Trial Review Order filed by Alsennawi, Dina; Finzi, Sharon.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Alsennawi, Dina. Refers to: Finzi, Sharon

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Alsennawi, Dina. Refers to: Finzi, Sharon Filed By: Alsennawi, Dina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Alsennawi, Dina .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Finzi, Sharon .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Advance Trial Review Order filed by Alsennawi, Dina; Finzi, Sharon. Filed By: Alsennawi, Dina (Plaintiff); Finzi, Sharon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Alsennawi, Dina; Finzi, Sharon. Filed By: Alsennawi, Dina (Plaintiff); Finzi, Sharon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 11/22/2013 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Status of Mediation process changed to Not settled at hearing on 05/03/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial filed by Finzi, Sharon. Refers to: Alsennawi, Dina Filed By: Finzi, Sharon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Finzi, Sharon. Refers to: Alsennawi, Dina Filed By: Finzi, Sharon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Alsennawi, Dina. Refers to: Finzi, Sharon Filed By: Alsennawi, Dina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Damages filed by Alsennawi, Dina.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alsennawi, Dina.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Alsennawi, Dina.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Alsennawi, Dina.

    Read MoreRead Less