This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 08:04:51 (UTC).

Allstate Insurance Company vs LSP Products Group Inc

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Allstate Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LSP Products Group Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Insurance Company

Defendant

LSP Products Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, JASON P

Defendant Attorney

Liedle, Matthew J

Attorney at LIEDLE & LARSON LLP

 

Court Documents

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by LSP Products Group Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 11/19/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in C-71 before Gregory W Pollack at Central.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Refers to: LSP Products Group Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Refers to: LSP Products Group Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Refers to: LSP Products Group Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Refers to: LSP Products Group Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 11/19/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in C-71 before Gregory W Pollack at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by LSP Products Group Inc. Filed By: LSP Products Group Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Refers to: LSP Products Group Inc Filed By: Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Refers to: LSP Products Group Inc Filed By: Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Refers to: LSP Products Group Inc Filed By: Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Refers to: LSP Products Group Inc Filed By: Allstate Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LSP Products Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, JASON P