This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 08:18:25 (UTC).

Alliance Multimedia LLC vs Locbit Inc

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 Alliance Multimedia LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Locbit Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alliance Multimedia LLC

Defendant

Locbit Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neal, Todd

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Rushford, Francis Gerard

2173 Salk Ave Suite 250

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Locbit, Inc.)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Locbit Inc.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 12/04/2020 at 11:00:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/15/2021 11:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/04/2020 11:00:00 AM.

Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC.

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/19/2021 11:00:00 AM.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc Filed By: Alliance Multimedia LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Locbit Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Alliance Multimedia LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 07/16/2021 at 11:00AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/19/2021 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/19/2021 at 11:00AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/15/2021 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 01/15/2021 at 11:00AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/04/2020 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Locbit Inc on Complaint filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 12/04/2020 at 11:00:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc Filed By: Alliance Multimedia LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc Filed By: Alliance Multimedia LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc Filed By: Alliance Multimedia LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Alliance Multimedia LLC. Refers to: Locbit Inc Filed By: Alliance Multimedia LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal, Todd