This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 03:58:40 (UTC).

Alicante Owners Association vs. Lennar-Intergulf [Allicante] LLC

Case Summary

On 04/30/2010 Alicante Owners Association filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Lennar-Intergulf Allicante LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ATLAS ANCHOR SYSTEMS USA CO

INTERGULF DEVELOPMENT [KETTNER] LLC; DBA : INTERGULF CONSTUCTION CORPORATION

MCGREGOR THOMPSON

SHERWOOD MECHANICAL INC

A&D FIRE PROTECTION INC

VULCAN MATERIALS COMPANY WESTERN DIVISION

H P FORMING INTERNATIONAL LTD

CM FIRESTOP INC

INTERGULF CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION; FKA : INTERGULF DEVELOPMENTS [KETTNER] CORP

INTERGULF DEVELOPMENT KETTNER CORP; DBA : INTERGULF CONSTRUCTION CORP;ESA : INTERGULF DEVELOPMENT KETTNER CORP

ADVANCED MECHANICAL INSULATION INC

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

INTERGULF DEVELOPMENT LLC

LAKEVIEW [LAKEWOOD] BUILDING

PROGRESSIVE STEEL FABRICATORS INC

LENNAR-INTERGULF [ALICANTE] LLC

STARLINE WINDOWS INC

AFDON CONTRACTING CA INC

GENERAL COATINGS CORPORATION

MALCOLM DRILLING COMPANY INC

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GIBSON, MICHAEL R

Attorney at HIGGS FLETCHER & MACK

First National Bank Center, 401 W A St

San Diego, CA 92101-7913

GAETA, ANTHONY P

225 Broadway Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

CERCOS, THEODORE R

Attorney at LINCOLN GUSTAFSON & CERCOS LLP

550 W C Street Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

HOWARD, JERRY WAYNE

Attorney at HIGGINS HARRIS SHERMAN & ROHR

Portola Ave

Palm Desert, CA 92260

SMILEY, DAVID W

KESSEL, BART L

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

515 S Flower Street 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

NAGPAL, VIK

HAGEN, CHRISTOPHER H

Attorney at WARD & HAGEN LLP

440 Stevens Avenue 350

Solana Beach, CA 92075

GOLDMAN, JAMES LEWIS

1925 Century Park East 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

YOUNG, KENYON M

NORRIS, SUZANNE T

PITINGARO, PAUL

MULLEN, MARTIN J

Attorney at ROWE MULLEN LLP

3636 Nobel Drive Ste 215

San Diego, CA 92122

GETTY, WILLIAM C

Attorney at WILSON GETTY LLP

12555 High Bluff Drive 270

San Diego, CA 92130

FERRENTINO, JOSEPH A

Attorney at NEWMEYER & DILLION LLP

895 Dove Street 5Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

REYNOLDS, JAMES J

VREVICH, BARRY M

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/08/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/08/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/15/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/15/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/15/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 07/29/2011 at 10:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/29/2011 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 07/06/2012 at 09:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Settlement Conference (Civil) reassigned to Luis R. Vargas for 06/08/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in C-63 at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 01/25/2013 at 09:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 01/11/2013 at 09:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/14/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/21/2012 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/01/2012 08:30:00 AM.

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC. Filed By: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC. Filed By: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to x/c filed on 11/10/11) filed by Perkins & Company Architecture and Urban Design SD Inc. Filed By: Perkins & Company Architecture and Urban Design SD Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC. Filed By: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice as to complaint) filed by Alicante Owners Association. Filed By: Alicante Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 12/14/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • DocketOSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 11/21/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DocketOSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 11/15/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • DocketThe Motion Hearing (Civil) was rescheduled to 12/14/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
308 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2010
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC. Filed By: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice filed by Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC. Filed By: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • DocketCertificate of Service filed by Alicante Owners Association. Filed By: Alicante Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DocketCertificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Court grants to 07/30/10 to serve) filed by Alicante Owners Association. Refers to: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC Filed By: Alicante Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First Amended) filed by Alicante Owners Association. Refers to: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC; H P Forming International LTD; San Diego Steel Holdings Group Inc; Courtney Inc; Peter Ross CA Inc; Advanced Mechanical Insulation Inc; Buchanan Company Inc; Cookson Company; Imagine That! Unlimited; A&D Fire Protection Inc; Afdon Contracting Ca Inc; Atlas Anchor Systems USA Co; CM Firestop Inc; Single Eagle Inc; Dutch Masonry Inc; General Coatings Corporation; Golden Image Window Coverings Inc; Hansen Architectural Systems Inc; Hightower Finishing Inc; La Mesa Glass Inc; Malcolm Drilling Company Inc; Otis Elevator Company; Progressive Steel Fabricators Inc; Sherwood Mechanical Inc; Southland Electric Inc; Lakeview [Lakewood] Building; McGregor Thompson; Lougheed Flooring Centre USA Inc; Ocean Pacific Lighting Inc; Silverwing Contracting Inc; Brian Cox Mechanical Inc; Starline Windows Inc; SUNCREST CABINETS USA INC; Vulcan Materials Company Western Division; West-Tech Contracting Inc; Intergulf Development [Kettner] LLC; Intergulf Construction Corporation; Star Team Installations Inc; Structural Shotcrete Systems Inc; Intergulf Development Corporation; INTERGULF DEVELOPMENT LLC; Intergulf Development Group; Intergulf Investment Corporation; Lennar Communities Inc; Lennar Homes of California Inc; Intergulf Development Kettner Corp; Intergulf Development [USA] Corp; Intergulf Development [Alicante] Corp; Lennar Urban Development Group; Intergulf Development LLC Filed By: Alicante Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by Alicante Owners Association. Refers to: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC; Advanced Mechanical Insulation Inc; Buchanan Company Inc; Cookson Company; Imagine That! Unlimited; A&D Fire Protection Inc; Afdon Contracting Ca Inc; Atlas Anchor Systems USA Co; CM Firestop Inc; Single Eagle Inc; Dutch Masonry Inc; General Coatings Corporation; Golden Image Window Coverings Inc; Hansen Architectural Systems Inc; Hightower Finishing Inc; La Mesa Glass Inc; Malcolm Drilling Company Inc; Otis Elevator Company; Progressive Steel Fabricators Inc; Sherwood Mechanical Inc; Southland Electric Inc; Lakeview [Lakewood] Building; McGregor Thompson; Lougheed Flooring Centre USA Inc; Ocean Pacific Lighting Inc; Silverwing Contracting Inc; Brian Cox Mechanical Inc; Starline Windows Inc; SUNCREST CABINETS USA INC; Vulcan Materials Company Western Division; West-Tech Contracting Inc; Intergulf Development [Kettner] LLC; Intergulf Construction Corporation; Star Team Installations Inc; Structural Shotcrete Systems Inc; Intergulf Development Corporation; INTERGULF DEVELOPMENT LLC; Intergulf Development Group; Intergulf Investment Corporation; Lennar Communities Inc; Lennar Homes of California Inc; Intergulf Development Kettner Corp; Intergulf Development [USA] Corp; Intergulf Development [Alicante] Corp; Lennar Urban Development Group Filed By: Alicante Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Alicante Owners Association. Refers to: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC Filed By: Alicante Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alicante Owners Association. Refers to: Lennar-Intergulf [Alicante] LLC Filed By: Alicante Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED MECHANICAL INSULATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VULCAN MATERIALS COMPANY WESTERN DIVISION is a litigant

Latest cases where H P FORMING INTERNATIONAL LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where SHERWOOD MECHANICAL INC is a litigant