This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/27/2018 at 04:36:26 (UTC).

Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000 vs. McWire Electric Inc

Case Summary

On 10/18/2012 Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000 filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against McWire Electric Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-EC

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 20

ALFRED ASSAD TRUSTEE OF THE GENE AND PATTI HANKEN FAMILY TRUST DATED JUNE 19, 2000

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

McGuire, Andrew

McWire Electric Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Feinberg, Mark D

Attorney at HEINZ & FEINBERG

401 W A Street Circle 1710

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEVSTIK, STEVEN C

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN C LEVSTIK

11839 Sorrento Valley Rd #39

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000. Refers to: McWire Electric Inc; McGuire, Andrew

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by McWire Electric Inc. Refers to: Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000

Answer

Answer (XC) filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000. Refers to: McWire Electric Inc

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement (and Proof of Service) filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/21/2013 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 07/26/2013 10:30:00 AM.

Order - Other

Order - Other (ORDER TO SHOW CASE RE: WHY DEFENDANTS PLEADINGS SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN AND DEFAULT ENTERED) filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000. Refers to: McWire Electric Inc; McGuire, Andrew

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by McGuire, Andrew; McWire Electric Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/22/2013 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[Another document for ROA# 44]

Request for Entry of Default

The default filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000 was denied. Refers to: McWire Electric Inc; McGuire, Andrew

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to Select Mediator / Arbitrator scheduled for 10/25/2013 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Mediation Selection Form

Mediation Selection Form filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to McWire Electric Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to McGuire, Andrew .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to McWire Electric Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000. Filed By: Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/14/2014 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2014 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Status of Mediation process changed to Settled at hearing on 09/23/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by HAYES, HON (ret) CHARLES R. Refers to: Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000; McGuire, Andrew; McWire Electric Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000. Filed By: Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Case reassigned from Judge Wohlfeil, Joel R. to Eddie Sturgeon effective 10/18/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000. Refers to: McWire Electric Inc; McGuire, Andrew Filed By: Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000. Refers to: McWire Electric Inc; McGuire, Andrew Filed By: Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000. Refers to: McWire Electric Inc; McGuire, Andrew Filed By: Alfred Assad Trustee of the Gene And Patti Hanken Family Trust Dated June 19, 2000 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.