This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2022 at 07:11:49 (UTC).

ALFEERAWI vs Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 ALFEERAWI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Volkswagen Group of America Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALFEERAWI, DALIL

Defendant

Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campbell, Valerie

Attorney at LEMONLAW

155 N Riverview Dr

Anaheim, CA 92808

Defendant Attorney

Conboy, Sean

555 S Flower St 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by ALFEERAWI, DALIL. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ALFEERAWI, DALIL. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by ALFEERAWI, DALIL. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by ALFEERAWI, DALIL. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc.; Filed By: Volkswagen Group of America Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by ALFEERAWI, DALIL. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: ALFEERAWI, DALIL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by ALFEERAWI, DALIL. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: ALFEERAWI, DALIL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by ALFEERAWI, DALIL. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: ALFEERAWI, DALIL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by ALFEERAWI, DALIL. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: ALFEERAWI, DALIL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONBOY SEAN P