This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/16/2018 at 03:20:29 (UTC).

Alberto Mayer vs. Jose Candelario

Case Summary

On 03/18/2011 Alberto Mayer filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Jose Candelario. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************M-SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAYER, ALBERTO

Defendants

CANDELARIO, JOSE

RISE CHIROPRACTIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, BRANDON M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BRANDON M SMITH

105 West F Street 3Rd Fl

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

FRANK, ROBERT W

Attorney at NEIL DYMOTT ET AL

1010 2Nd Ave #2500

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/08/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/08/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/07/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/10/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/10/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/23/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2012
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 06/15/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mayer, Alberto. Refers to: Candelario, Jose; RISE Chiropractic Filed By: Mayer, Alberto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • Status of Mediation process changed to Settled before hearing on 02/23/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place (The case settled prior to the mediation date) filed by MCINTYRE, MONTY A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Candelario, Jose; RISE Chiropractic. Filed By: Candelario, Jose (Defendant); RISE Chiropractic (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 06/15/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • The Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) was rescheduled to 06/15/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in S-07 before Kenneth J Medel at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2012
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) reassigned to Medel, Kenneth for 07/27/2012 at 08:35:00 AM in S-07 at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/23/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/08/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • Answer filed by RISE Chiropractic; Candelario, Jose. Refers to: Mayer, Alberto Filed By: RISE Chiropractic (Defendant); Candelario, Jose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • Answer filed by RISE Chiropractic; Candelario, Jose. Refers to: Mayer, Alberto Filed By: RISE Chiropractic (Defendant); Candelario, Jose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • Answer filed by RISE Chiropractic; Candelario, Jose. Refers to: Mayer, Alberto Filed By: RISE Chiropractic (Defendant); Candelario, Jose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mayer, Alberto. Refers to: Candelario, Jose Filed By: Mayer, Alberto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Mayer, Alberto.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mayer, Alberto.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2011
  • Complaint filed by Mayer, Alberto.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.