This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/30/2019 at 17:16:21 (UTC).

Albert Calderon vs Total Wealth Management Inc

Case Summary

On 05/16/2014 Albert Calderon filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Total Wealth Management Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN S. MEYER. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN S. MEYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Calderon, Albert

GREEN, DAVID

DURSCHLAG, AMY

WILLETT, DAVID KIP

WYNNE, TUULA

BRYANT, CHRISTOPHER

CLUGSTON, DONALD

RASOR, GEORGE

ANTONUCCI, SUSAN

Defendants

Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP

Cooper, Jacob

Cooper, Jed

Total Wealth Management Inc

LUKIN, MARK

LJL FUNDING LLC

ALTUS CONSERVATIVE PORTFOLIO SERIES, LP

AEGIS HOSPITALITY HOLDINGS, LLC

PINNACLE WEALTH GROUP, INC.

SJOSTROM, JOEL

PRIVATE PLACEMENT CAPITAL NOTES II, LLC

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aguirre, Michael J

Attorney at AGUIRRE & SEVERSON LLP

501 W Broadway #1050

San Diego, CA 92101

JONNA, PAUL M

Attorney at LIMANDRI & JONNA LLP

P O Box 9120

Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

SEVERSON, MARIA C

Attorney at AGUIRRE & SEVERSON LLP

1050 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

AGUIRRE, MICHAEL

501 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

DEL CASTILLO, JOSHUA A

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LL

515 S Figueroa Street 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MATAELE, 'ISI

Attorney at MATAELE LAW OFFICES

4660 La Jolla Village Dr Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92122

GERACI, CHRISTINA L

Attorney at GERACI LAW FIRM APC

2302 Martin #410

Irvine, CA 92612

Other Attorneys

KATUNICH, LAUREN J

Attorney at LATHROP & GAGE LLP

1000 Century Park E

Los Angeles, CA 90067

RITTERBECK, JAMIE M

Attorney at KLINEDINST PC

501 W Broadway #600

San Diego, CA 92101

SLOME, TROY H

444 South Flower Street Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Cooper, Jacob; Total Wealth Management Inc; Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP.

[Proprosed] Order RE Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel ([Proposed] Order RE Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) submitted by Cooper, Jacob; Total Wealth Management Inc; Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP received but not filed on 02/04/2015.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Cooper, Jacob; Total Wealth Management Inc; Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Calderon, Albert.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/26/2014 08:30:00 AM.

of Erick m Cavadas

Declaration - Other (of Erick m Cavadas) filed by Calderon, Albert; Gleason, Inga; Antonucci, Susan; Bryant, Christopher; Willett, David Kip; Green, David; Cartier, Jolie; Clugston, Donald; Rasor, George; Cornell, Choyunn;OTHERS.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Donald Clugston) filed by Calderon, Albert.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Dionne, Mark; Socal Tax Firm.

for Further order Following Receiver's Initial and Supplemental Reports

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for Further Order Following Receiver's Initial and Supplemental Reports) filed by Gleason, Inga; Antonucci, Susan; Bryant, Christopher; Willett, David Kip; Green, David; Cartier, Jolie; Clugston, Donald; Rasor, George; Cornell, Choyunn; Sitto, Michael;OTHERS.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Dionne, Mark; Socal Tax Firm.

of Maria C Severson

Declaration - Other (of Maria C Severson) filed by Gleason, Inga; Antonucci, Susan; Bryant, Christopher; Willett, David Kip; Green, David; Cartier, Jolie; Clugston, Donald; Rasor, George; Cornell, Choyunn; Sitto, Michael;OTHERS.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (OF JACOB K COOPER) filed by Cooper, Jacob; Total Wealth Management Inc; Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP.

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (to Mark Dionne and Socal Tax Firms Demurrer) filed by Calderon, Albert; Gleason, Inga; Antonucci, Susan; Bryant, Christopher; Willett, David Kip; Green, David; Cartier, Jolie; Clugston, Donald; Rasor, George; Cornell, Choyunn;OTHERS.

Motion - Other

Motion to Strike filed by Dionne, Mark; Socal Tax Firm.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Cooper, Jacob; Total Wealth Management Inc; Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP.

Amended Notice of Demurrer

Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Demurrer) filed by LJL Secure High Yield Income Fund LLC; LJL Funding LLC; Andesite Mortgage Pool, LLC; Andesite Finance Company LLC; Lakosil, Susan.

of Maria C Severson

Declaration - Other (of Maria C Severson) filed by Gleason, Inga; Antonucci, Susan; Bryant, Christopher; Willett, David Kip; Green, David; Cartier, Jolie; Clugston, Donald; Rasor, George; Cornell, Choyunn; Sitto, Michael;OTHERS.

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINMENT OF RECEIVER) filed by Cooper, Jacob; Total Wealth Management Inc; Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP.

188 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2015
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 08/12/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Discovery Hearing scheduled for 08/14/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 08/21/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/21/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/28/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 08/28/2015 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 03/18/2016 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/08/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 04/22/2016 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by First Trust Company of Onaga. Filed By: First Trust Company of Onaga (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
246 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2014
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 08/14/2014 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Calderon, Albert. Refers to: Total Wealth Management Inc Filed By: Calderon, Albert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Calderon, Albert. Refers to: Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP Filed By: Calderon, Albert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/27/2015 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Calderon, Albert. Refers to: Total Wealth Management Inc; Cooper, Jacob; Cooper, Jed; Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP Filed By: Calderon, Albert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Calderon, Albert. Refers to: Total Wealth Management Inc; Cooper, Jacob; Cooper, Jed; Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP Filed By: Calderon, Albert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Calderon, Albert. Refers to: Total Wealth Management Inc; Cooper, Jacob; Cooper, Jed; Altus Capital Opportunity Fund LP Filed By: Calderon, Albert (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.