This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 06:37:20 (UTC).

Akua Behavioral Health Inc vs Vibal

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Akua Behavioral Health Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Vibal. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Akua Behavioral Health Inc

Defendant

Vibal, Liliosa D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kahana, Amir M

Defendant Attorney

Wright, Michael

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Vibal, Liliosa D.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Vibal, Liliosa D.

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Akua Behavioral Health Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Akua Behavioral Health Inc. Refers to: Vibal, Liliosa

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Akua Behavioral Health Inc. Refers to: Vibal, Liliosa

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Akua Behavioral Health Inc. Refers to: Vibal, Liliosa

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Vibal, Liliosa D. Filed By: Vibal, Liliosa D (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Vibal, Liliosa D. Filed By: Vibal, Liliosa D (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by Akua Behavioral Health Inc. Filed By: Akua Behavioral Health Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Akua Behavioral Health Inc. Refers to: Vibal, Liliosa Filed By: Akua Behavioral Health Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Akua Behavioral Health Inc. Refers to: Vibal, Liliosa Filed By: Akua Behavioral Health Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Akua Behavioral Health Inc. Refers to: Vibal, Liliosa Filed By: Akua Behavioral Health Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less