Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 12:25:11 (UTC).

Aker vs 435 East Realty Co LLC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Aker filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 435 East Realty Co LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kantzavelos, Patricia

Aker, Levent

Defendants

Mynd Management Inc; DBA : Mynd Property Management

435 East Realty Co LLC

KS Industries; DBA : Pacific Shore Management

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thompson, Anthony D

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HAROLD D THOMPSON

Defendant Attorney

REAGAN, BARRY J

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Other

Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by 435 East Realty Co LLC.

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike filed by 435 East Realty Co LLC.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice (in support of motion to strike) filed by 435 East Realty Co LLC.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (granting order on motion to strike) submitted by 435 East Realty Co LLC received but not filed on 02/22/2021.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by 435 East Realty Co LLC.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions (NOT ENTERED) filed by Aker, Levent.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Aker, Levent; Kantzavelos, Patricia. Refers to: 435 East Realty Co LLC; Mynd Management Inc; KS Industries

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aker, Levent; Kantzavelos, Patricia. Refers to: 435 East Realty Co LLC; Mynd Management Inc; KS Industries

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Aker, Levent; Kantzavelos, Patricia. Refers to: 435 East Realty Co LLC; Mynd Management Inc; KS Industries

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by 435 East Realty Co LLC. Filed By: 435 East Realty Co LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions (NOT ENTERED) filed by Aker, Levent. Filed By: Aker, Levent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike filed by 435 East Realty Co LLC. Filed By: 435 East Realty Co LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in support of motion to strike) filed by 435 East Realty Co LLC. Filed By: 435 East Realty Co LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (granting order on motion to strike) submitted by 435 East Realty Co LLC received but not filed on 02/22/2021. Filed By: 435 East Realty Co LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Meet and Confer filed by 435 East Realty Co LLC. Filed By: 435 East Realty Co LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Aker, Levent; Kantzavelos, Patricia. Refers to: 435 East Realty Co LLC; Mynd Management Inc; KS Industries Filed By: Aker, Levent (Plaintiff); Kantzavelos, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aker, Levent; Kantzavelos, Patricia. Refers to: 435 East Realty Co LLC; Mynd Management Inc; KS Industries Filed By: Aker, Levent (Plaintiff); Kantzavelos, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Aker, Levent; Kantzavelos, Patricia. Refers to: 435 East Realty Co LLC; Mynd Management Inc; KS Industries Filed By: Aker, Levent (Plaintiff); Kantzavelos, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mynd Management Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thompson, Anthony D