This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 08:24:39 (UTC).

Ahmed vs Alvarado

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Ahmed filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Alvarado. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahmed, Uzma

Defendants

California Department of Transportation

EAN Holdings LLC

Navarro, Lucia

San Diego Association of Governments

Sicay Alvarado, Henry Estuardo

The City of San Diego

City of San Diego

State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation; ESA : California Department of Transportation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aman, Philip C

Attorney at FRANTZ LAW GROUP APLC

402 W Broadway # 860

San Diego, CA 92101

Harris, William P III

Attorney at FRANTZ LAW GROUP APLC

402 W Broadway # 860

San Diego, CA 92101

Frantz, James P

402 W Broadway # 860

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Stepovich, Sonia M I

Attorney at STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTAT

Parking Lot, 4050 Taylor St

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Refers to: Sicay Alvarado, Henry; Navarro, Lucia; EAN Holdings LLC; San Diego Association of Governments; The City of San Diego; California Department of Transportation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Refers to: Sicay Alvarado, Henry; Navarro, Lucia; EAN Holdings LLC; San Diego Association of Governments; The City of San Diego; California Department of Transportation

Complaint

Complaint filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Refers to: Sicay Alvarado, Henry; Navarro, Lucia; EAN Holdings LLC; San Diego Association of Governments; The City of San Diego; California Department of Transportation

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma.

Request for Dismissal re Sandag

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to San Diego Association of Governments ONLY; Not Entered) filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Refers to: San Diego Association of Governments

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by The City of San Diego.

Answer

Answer (to plaintiffs complaint) filed by City of San Diego.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation.

DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Answer filed by State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to San Diego Association of Governments ONLY; Not Entered) filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Refers to: San Diego Association of Governments Filed By: Ahmed, Uzma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to plaintiffs complaint) filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by The City of San Diego. Filed By: The City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation. Filed By: State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation. Filed By: State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation. Filed By: State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Filed By: Ahmed, Uzma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Filed By: Ahmed, Uzma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Filed By: Ahmed, Uzma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Filed By: Ahmed, Uzma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Filed By: Ahmed, Uzma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Refers to: Sicay Alvarado, Henry; Navarro, Lucia; EAN Holdings LLC; San Diego Association of Governments; The City of San Diego; State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation; City of San Diego Filed By: Ahmed, Uzma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Refers to: Sicay Alvarado, Henry; Navarro, Lucia; EAN Holdings LLC; San Diego Association of Governments; The City of San Diego; State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation Filed By: Ahmed, Uzma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ahmed, Uzma. Refers to: Sicay Alvarado, Henry; Navarro, Lucia; EAN Holdings LLC; San Diego Association of Governments; The City of San Diego; State of California Acting By and Through the Department of Transportation Filed By: Ahmed, Uzma (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Diego Association of Governments is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stepovich, Sonia M I