Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/03/2020 at 01:23:42 (UTC).

Aguilar vs Santiago

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Aguilar filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Santiago. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aguilar, Aleha Jane

Defendants

Santiago, Juliann Eleazar

Santiago, Joshia Eleazar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levy, Guy

Attorney at GUY LEVY LAW

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (doe 1) filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Refers to: Santiago, Joshia

Complaint

Complaint filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Refers to: Santiago, Juliann

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Refers to: Santiago, Juliann

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Refers to: Santiago, Juliann

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Filed By: Aguilar, Aleha Jane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Filed By: Aguilar, Aleha Jane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (doe 1) filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Refers to: Santiago, Joshia Filed By: Aguilar, Aleha Jane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Refers to: Santiago, Juliann; Santiago, Joshia Filed By: Aguilar, Aleha Jane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Refers to: Santiago, Juliann Filed By: Aguilar, Aleha Jane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Aguilar, Aleha Jane. Refers to: Santiago, Juliann Filed By: Aguilar, Aleha Jane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less